Myers v. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Gregory B. Myers
Defendant: The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America and Berkshire Life Insurance Company Of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00061
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Deadline terminated - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff terminated - Order entered. (cmar, )
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the record and the representations made by the parties in their discovery plan, it is ordered that: 1. The Rule 26(f) report (Dkt. No. #9 ) filed by the parties is approved unless modified by the court herein or hereafter. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 02/14/19. (cmar, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Discovery Plan by Berkshire Life Insurance Company Of America, The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America.(Stephens, Edwin)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 2/12/2019. (dvanm, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Roger Charles Simmons and Certification of Local Counsel Bernard E. Goodman Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6487800. by Gregory B. Myers. (Goodman, Bernard)
February 8, 2019 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (rban, )
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the parties confer to consider the claims, defenses, possibilities of a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, trial before a magistrate judge, to arrange for the disclosures by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and to develop a joint discovery plan. An amended proposed discovery plan shall be filed by 2/13/2019 and the Initial Pretrial Conference shall be continued to 2/20/2019; that plaintiff's failure to comply with court order could result in a dismissal with prejudice of the civil action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 2/8/2019. (rban, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard Edwin Goodman on behalf of Gregory B. Myers (Goodman, Bernard)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 Discovery Plan by Berkshire Life Insurance Company Of America, The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America.(Stephens, Edwin)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Roman Lifson on behalf of Berkshire Life Insurance Company Of America, The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (Lifson, Roman)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 6/14/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
January 16, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6448594.), filed by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Berkshire Life Insurance Company Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Appendix Financial Interest Disclosure Statement, #6 Appendix Financial Interest Disclosure Statement)(Stephens, Edwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory B. Myers
Represented By: Bernard Edwin Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Edwin Ford Stephens
Represented By: Roman Lifson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Life Insurance Company Of America
Represented By: Edwin Ford Stephens
Represented By: Roman Lifson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?