Republic Franklin Insurance Company v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Republic Franklin Insurance Company
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company, John Wayne Heddings, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Medford J. Brown, IV, Accident Fund Holdings, Inc., Global Automotive, Inc. and Thomas A Smith
Case Number: 1:2019cv00083
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Progressive by Republic Franklin Insurance Company. (Friedman, Sanford)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for John Heddings by Republic Franklin Insurance Company. (Friedman, Sanford)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Global Automotive by Republic Franklin Insurance Company. (Friedman, Sanford)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Medford J. Brown by Republic Franklin Insurance Company. (Friedman, Sanford)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Accident Fund by Republic Franklin Insurance Company. (Friedman, Sanford)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for GEICO by Republic Franklin Insurance Company. (Friedman, Sanford)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Thomas Smith by Republic Franklin Insurance Company. (Friedman, Sanford)
February 1, 2019 Notice of Correction re #2 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that document [document number] is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (dvanm, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 DOCUMENTS REMOVED - FILED IN ERROR - Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Republic Franklin Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #2 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #5 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #6 Exhibit Proposed Summons)(Friedman, Sanford) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/1/2019) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/1/2019) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/1/2019) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/1/2019) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 2/1/2019) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 5 replaced on 2/1/2019) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 6 replaced on 2/1/2019) (dvanm, ). Modified on 2/1/2019 (dvanm, ).
January 23, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6458309.), filed by Republic Franklin Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Sanford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Franklin Insurance Company v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wayne Heddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medford J. Brown, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accident Fund Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Franklin Insurance Company
Represented By: Sanford A. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?