Hutchins v. Unknown
Plaintiff: Todd Hutchins
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 1:2019cv00149
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's letter/complaint be and is conditionally filed pending compliance with the requirements of this Order; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff is assessed a filing fee of $350.00 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1914(a) and an administrative fee of $50.00; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is conditionally granted to the extent that plaintiff need not prepay the filing fee at this time; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall complete and file a form 1983 complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's failure to comply with any part of this Order within THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DA TE OF THIS ORDER, or failure to notify this Court immediately upon being transferred, released, or otherwise relocated, may result in the dismissal of this complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 4/1/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copies mailed as directed in the order.
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd Hutchins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt letter sent to Todd A. Hutchins. (acha, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown (Filing fee $ 400., not paid), filed by Todd Hutchins. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Data Sheet, #2 Envelope)(acha, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchins v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?