Downey v. Herring et al
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Defendant: Arlington County, Virginia, Steven MacIsaac, Belfor USA Group Inc. and Mark Herring
Case Number: 1:2019cv00198
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Per IDD chambers motions set for 3/29/19 have been cancelled (clar, )
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Amended Complaints are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and this civil action is hereby TERMINATED. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 03/26/2019. (c/s to Plaintiff)(jlan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Expedite by Mark Downey. (jlan)
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #17 MOTION, #16 MOTION to Expedite, #15 MOTION to Seal Case : Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Limit Counsel Due to Conspiracy by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Expedite by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Seal by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arlington County, Virginia, Belfor USA Group Inc., Mark Herring, Steven MacIsaac, filed by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arlington County, Virginia, Belfor USA Group Inc., Mark Herring, Steven MacIsaac, filed by Mark Downey.(dvanm, )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion to Expedite; finding as moot #9 Motion to Seal; finding as moot #10 Motion to Limit Counsel Due to Conspiracy. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 02/26/2019. (c/s to Plaintiff) (jlan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION to Limit Counsel due to Conspiracy, #8 MOTION to Expedite, #9 MOTION to Seal : Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Limit Counsel due to Conspiracy by Mark Downey. (jlan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Seal by Mark Downey. (jlan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlan)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff will have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff has also filed a "Motion to Expedite," (Dkt. 3) "Motion to Seal," (Dkt. 4) and Motion to Limit Counsel Due to Conspiracy" (Dkt. 5). Because Plaintiffs Complaint has been dismissed without prejudice, all three of these Motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 02/25/2019. (c/s to Plaintiff)(jlan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION to Limit Counsel due to Conspiracy, #4 MOTION to Seal, #3 MOTION to Expedite : Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (jlan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Limit Counsel due to Conspiracy by Mark Downey. (jlan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal by Mark Downey. (jlan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite by Mark Downey. (jlan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Downey. (jlan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arlington County, Virginia, Belfor USA Group Inc., Mark Herring, Steven MacIsaac filed by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey v. Herring et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlington County, Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven MacIsaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belfor USA Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?