Raytheon Company v. BAE Systems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Raytheon Company
Defendant: BAE Systems, Inc., BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC and Leonardo DRS, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00251
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #77 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 4/25/2019. (dvanm, )
April 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #74 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, #77 MOTION to Seal , #82 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Or, In The Alternative, for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 84 Notice of Hearing Date for DRS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint or Alternatively for Summary Judgment set for 5/10/19 re #82 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Or, In The Alternative, for Summary Judgment (Chudd, Daniel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 83 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively for Summary Judgment to #82 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Or, In The Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC, Leonardo DRS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit In Support of Memorandum)(Chudd, Daniel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Or, In The Alternative, for Summary Judgment by DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC, Leonardo DRS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Granting Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment)(Chudd, Daniel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 81 Notice of Hearing Date set for 5/10/2019 re #80 Memorandum in Support, #77 MOTION to Seal (Jacobs, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 80 Memorandum in Support re #77 MOTION to Seal filed by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 79 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #77 MOTION to Seal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jacobs, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 78 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc. re #77 MOTION to Seal (Jacobs, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Seal by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 76 Notice of Hearing Date set for 5/10/2019 re #75 Memorandum in Support, #74 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement (Jacobs, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 75 Memorandum in Support re #74 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit B - UNDER SEAL)(Jacobs, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #68 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/5/2019. (dvanm, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 72 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Verified Complaint) against BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc., DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC, Leonardo DRS, Inc., filed by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lantier, Gregory)
April 4, 2019 Filing 71 Sealed Document (First Amended Verified Complaint) re #1 Complaint. (Lantier, Gregory)
April 4, 2019 Filing 70 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Raytheon Company re #68 MOTION to Seal (Lantier, Gregory)
April 4, 2019 Filing 69 Memorandum in Support re #68 MOTION to Seal filed by Raytheon Company. (Lantier, Gregory)
April 4, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION to Seal by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lantier, Gregory)
April 3, 2019 Filing 67 USCA Case Number 19-1343 4th CCA, case manager Richard Sewell, for #65 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Raytheon Company. (dvanm, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 66 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #65 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (dvanm, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #59 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Raytheon Company. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0422-6560311. (Lantier, Gregory)
March 26, 2019 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/19/2019, before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2019.(thomson, anneliese)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC answer due 4/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/22/2019. (aott)
March 22, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC, Leonardo DRS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chudd, Daniel)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP answer due 4/8/2019; BAE Systems, Inc. answer due 4/8/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/22/2019. (dvanm, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff Raytheon Company's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction [Dkt. No. 3] be and is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/19/19. (yguy)
March 19, 2019 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 3/19/2019. Appearances of counsel. Pltf's #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is argued and DENIED. (order to follow) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS Raytheon's Motion to File Under Seal. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the unredacted versions of Raytheon's Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Exhibit B thereto under seal.(see order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/19/19. (yguy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 56 Reply to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B- Declaration)(Lantier, Gregory)
March 18, 2019 Filing 55 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B- Sealed Declaration)(Lantier, Gregory)
March 18, 2019 Filing 54 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Raytheon Company re #52 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Exhibit B (Lantier, Gregory)
March 18, 2019 Filing 53 Memorandum in Support re #52 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Exhibit B filed by Raytheon Company. (Lantier, Gregory)
March 18, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Exhibit B by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lantier, Gregory)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/18/2019. (dvanm, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/18/2019. (dvanm, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/18/2019. (dvanm, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/18/2019. (dvanm, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/18/2019. (dvanm, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/18/2019. (dvanm, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/18/2019. (dvanm, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/18/2019. (dvanm, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of Service of Pro Hac Vice Motions of Warren Jay DeVecchio, Locke Bell, and Caitlin Crujido by Daniel Edward Chudd on behalf of DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC, Leonardo DRS, Inc. (Chudd, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 42 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Caitlin Crujido and Certification of Local Counsel Daniel E. Chudd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6543386. by DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC, Leonardo DRS, Inc.. (Chudd, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 41 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Locke Bell and Certification of Local Counsel Daniel E. Chudd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6543379. by DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC, Leonardo DRS, Inc.. (Chudd, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 40 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Warren Jay DeVecchio and Certification of Local Counsel Daniel E. Chudd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6543370. by DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC, Leonardo DRS, Inc.. (Chudd, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leonardo DRS, Inc., DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC. (Chudd, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 38 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Hathaway Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Smith Declaration)(Chudd, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 37 Memorandum in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (REDACTED) filed by DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC, Leonardo DRS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2- Redacted Declaration)(Chudd, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 36 Memorandum in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction REDACTED filed by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - REDACTED, #2 Exhibit 2 - REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 3 - REDACTED, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Jacobs, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Seal Response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC, Leonardo DRS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Hearing, #3 Proposed Order)(Chudd, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Hearing Date re #29 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Exhibits 1-3 Thereto (Jacobs, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 33 Memorandum in Support re #29 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Exhibits 1-3 Thereto filed by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC, Leonardo DRS, Inc. (Chudd, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 31 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #4 Memorandum in Support, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Jacobs, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc. re #29 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Exhibits 1-3 Thereto (Jacobs, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Exhibits 1-3 Thereto by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 28 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP. (Jacobs, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 27 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BAE Systems, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Service re #24 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicole Owren-Wiest and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Jacobs Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6543199. , #25 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Vincent Galluzzo and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Jacobs Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6543211. , #23 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Supko and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Jacobs Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6543186. , #22 Notice of Appearance by Michael Harry Jacobs on behalf of BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc. (Jacobs, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 25 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Vincent Galluzzo and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Jacobs Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6543211. by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 24 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicole Owren-Wiest and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Jacobs Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6543199. by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 23 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Supko and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Jacobs Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6543186. by BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Harry Jacobs on behalf of BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc. (Jacobs, Michael)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/11/2019. (dvanm, )
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/11/2019. (dvanm, )
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/11/2019. (dvanm, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service re #16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas G. Sprankling and Certification of Local Counsel Gregory H. Lantier Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6531836. , #17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Spencer Gall and Certification of Local Counsel Gregory H. Lantier Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6531962. , #15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Shipley and Certification of Local Counsel Gregory H. Lantier Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6531623. by Gregory Hayes Lantier on behalf of Raytheon Company (Lantier, Gregory)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Spencer Gall and Certification of Local Counsel Gregory H. Lantier Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6531962. by Raytheon Company. (Lantier, Gregory)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas G. Sprankling and Certification of Local Counsel Gregory H. Lantier Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6531836. by Raytheon Company. (Lantier, Gregory)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Shipley and Certification of Local Counsel Gregory H. Lantier Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6531623. by Raytheon Company. (Lantier, Gregory)
March 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
March 4, 2019 Per LMB chambers #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 3/22/19 attorney to file an Amended Notice of Hearing please see order #11 dated 3/1/2019 - Deadlines Terminated (clar, )
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion to Expedite. ORDERED that defendants file any opposition to plaintiff's motion for a preliminaryinjunction no later than Friday, March 15, 2019, and that plaintiff file any reply no later than 5:00 PM on Monday, March 18, 2019. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/4/2019. (dvanm, )
March 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Memorandum in Support by Raytheon Company. (Lantier, Gregory)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Raytheon Company re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Lantier, Gregory)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff file an amended notice setting a hearing date for Tuesday, March 19, 2019 at 10:00 AM; Friday, April 5,2019 at 10:00 AM; or any Friday after April 5 that is convenient. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/1/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP, BAE Systems, Inc., DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC, Leonardo DRS, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
March 1, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC by Raytheon Company. (Lantier, Gregory)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Leonardo DRS, Inc. by Raytheon Company. (Lantier, Gregory)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP by Raytheon Company. (Lantier, Gregory)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to BAE Systems, Inc. by Raytheon Company. (Lantier, Gregory)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Hearing Date set for March 22, 2019 @ 10:00 a.m. re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Lantier, Gregory)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Raytheon Company. (Lantier, Gregory)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Raytheon Company. (Lantier, Gregory)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Raytheon Company. (Lantier, Gregory)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint (Verified Complaint) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6518721.), filed by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Lantier, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raytheon Company v. BAE Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAE Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Harry Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP
Represented By: Michael Harry Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRS Network & Imaging Systems, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Edward Chudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonardo DRS, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Edward Chudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raytheon Company
Represented By: Gregory Hayes Lantier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?