Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company
Defendant: Thomas B Smith, ADDX Corporation, Future Technologies Inc. and Client Solutions Architects LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00254
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 52 Memorandum in Support re #51 Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant Thomas B. Smith filed by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company. (Mengel, Paul)
April 29, 2019 Filing 51 Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant Thomas B. Smith by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company. (Mengel, Paul)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 So Ordered re #49 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Client Solutions Architects, LLC filed by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/26/2019. (dest, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 49 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Client Solutions Architects, LLC by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company. (Mengel, Paul)
April 24, 2019 Filing 48 Docketed in Error and Removed (lcre, ) Modified on 4/25/2019 (lcre, ). (Main Document 48 replaced on 4/25/2019) (lcre, ).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDERED that plaintiff immediately obtain entry of default from the Clerk pursuant to Fed.R.Civ. 55(a) and it is further ORDERED that promptly after obtaining the entry of default, plaintiff file a motion for default judgment and an accompanying memorandum setting forth the factual and legal supportfor findings. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/24/2019. (lcre, )(c/s per ORDER)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Discovery due by 9/13/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, defendant ADDX Corporation's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 33] is GRANTED and plaintiffs Motion to Seal [Dkt. No, 35] is DENIED. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs Complaint be and is DIMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to defendant ADDX.Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/19/19. (yguy)
April 19, 2019 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 4/19/2019. Appearances of counsel. Motions are argued. Deft's #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED. Pltf's #35 MOTION to Seal Limited Passages of Hearing Transcript is DENIED. (order to follow) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
April 15, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION in Opposition to Motion to Seal Transcript filed by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mengel, Paul)
April 15, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Seal Limited Passages of Hearing Transcript, #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
April 15, 2019 Per LMB chambers document #41 is styled as a Motion but its an Opposition to pltf's motion to seal (clar, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 42 Notice of Hearing Date re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #35 MOTION to Seal Limited Passages of Hearing Transcript (Finnerty, Samuel)
April 12, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION in Opposition to Motion to Seal Transcript by ADDX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support)(Murphy, Paul)
April 11, 2019 Filing 40 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by ADDX Corporation. (Murphy, Paul)
April 5, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company. (Mengel, Paul)
April 4, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Scott Langston Finnerty on behalf of Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company (Finnerty, Samuel)
April 1, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE by ADDX Corporation Waiver of Oral Argument (Murphy, Paul)
March 29, 2019 Filing 36 Memorandum in Support re #35 MOTION to Seal Limited Passages of Hearing Transcript filed by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company. (Mengel, Paul)
March 29, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Seal Limited Passages of Hearing Transcript by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mengel, Paul)
March 26, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint by Future Technologies Inc..(King, Bryan)
March 25, 2019 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (lcre, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ADDX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Nondisclosure Agreement)(Murphy, Paul)
March 18, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADDX Corporation. (Murphy, Paul)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDERED that Plaintiff is not required to give or post any security in order for the Preliminary injunction Order to issue: and it is further ORDERED that the parties were provided judicial notice of the terms of this Order during the March 8,2019 hearing, and this Order shall be effective as of that date. (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/15/19. (yguy)
March 15, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Filing Proposed Order (Mengel, Paul)
March 11, 2019 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/8/2019, before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019.(thomson, anneliese)
March 11, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Opposition by ADDX Corporation. (Murphy, Paul)
March 8, 2019 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 3/8/2019. Appearances of counsel. Deft Smith appeared by telephone. Pltf's #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is argued and GRANTED. Pltf counsel directed to draft language in order and submit to the Court. (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice of Lee Dougherty. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/8/2019. (lcre, )
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice of Eric Josh Pelletler. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/8/2019. (lcre, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Future Technologies Inc.. (King, Bryan)
March 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company re #4 Memorandum in Support Notice of Filing Corrected Supplemental Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit James Black Declaration, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Black Declaration)(Mengel, Paul)
March 7, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company re #4 Memorandum in Support Notice of Filing Supplemental Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit James Black Declaration)(Mengel, Paul)
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by William Thomas Welch on behalf of Client Solutions Architects LLC (Welch, William)
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company Future Technologies Inc. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019 (lcre, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company Thomas B Smith served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019 (lcre, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Future Technologies Inc.. (King, Bryan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Opposition by ADDX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Milward Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Nondisclosure Agreement)(Murphy, Paul) Modified on 3/8/2019 (lcre, ).
March 7, 2019 Notice of Correction: The signature block on the document does not match the user's login. The filing user has been notified and has been asked to either refile the document or to have the attorney whose signature block appears on the document refile the document re #11 Notice Regarding Representation (lcre, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Submission of Proposed Order by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Filing Proposed Order (Mengel, Paul)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lee Dougherty and Certification of Local Counsel Paul N. Murphy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6527646. by ADDX Corporation. (Murphy, Paul)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric J. Pelletier and Certification of Local Counsel Bryan R. King Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6527224. by Future Technologies Inc.. (King, Bryan)
March 6, 2019 Notice of Correction : Document is not signed by local counsel. Please sign and refile with appropriate signature re #9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lee Dougherty and Certification of Local Counsel Paul N. Murphy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6524176. (lcre, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas R. Kay on behalf of Future Technologies Inc. (Kay, Douglas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Robert King on behalf of Future Technologies Inc. (King, Bryan)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 Notice Regarding Representation by ADDX Corporation (Murphy, Paul)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Nesbitt Murphy on behalf of ADDX Corporation (Murphy, Paul)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lee Dougherty and Certification of Local Counsel Paul N. Murphy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6524176. by ADDX Corporation. (Murphy, Paul)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to ADDX Corporation, Client Solutions Architects LLC, Future Technologies Inc., Thomas B Smith. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(lcre, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint on Thomas Smith, ADDX, Future Technologies and Client Solution Architects by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company. (Mengel, Paul)
March 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company re #1 Complaint of Filing of Civil Cover Sheet (Mengel, Paul)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company. (Mengel, Paul)
March 4, 2019 Notice of Correction: The civil coversheet required is missing. Please file the document re #1 Complaint (lcre, )
March 3, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mengel, Paul)
March 1, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (lcre, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Hearing Date set for March 8, 2019 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Mengel, Paul)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company. (Mengel, Paul)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6519145.), filed by Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Mengel, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADDX Corporation
Represented By: Paul Nesbitt Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Douglas R. Kay
Represented By: Bryan Robert King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Client Solutions Architects LLC
Represented By: William Thomas Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nova Technologies An Employee-Owned Engineering Company
Represented By: Paul Warren Mengel
Represented By: Samuel Scott Langston Finnerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?