Webb v. U.S. Merit Systems Protection Board

Plaintiff: Michael D. Webb and Major Mike Webb
Defendant: U.S. Merit Systems Protection Board
Case Number: 1:2019cv00257
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney; served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (pmil, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General; served 04/23/19 (pmil, )
April 24, 2019 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re: #13 Notice of Appeal. (pmil, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 16 Letter to Court from USCA requesting transmittal of record. (pmil, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 15 USCA Case Number 19-1436 4th Circuit, case manager Cathy Poulsen for #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael D. Webb. (pmil, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 14 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re: #13 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (pmil, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order of 04/05/19 by Michael D. Webb. (this notice of appeal was filed at the 4th circuit on 04/17/19 and rec'd in the district court on 04/22/19) (Attachments: #1 USCA Letter, #2 Envelope)(pmil, )
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Pltf's #10 Motion to Reconsider is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 04/05/19. (copy mailed to pltf) (pmil, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #10 Complaint and Petition for Declaratory Relief MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 Complaint and Petition for Declaratory Relief MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Michael D. Webb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(clar, )
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 03/25/19. (c/s: pltf) (pmil, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing (Change) on Motion for Temporary Injunctive Relief (clar, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Submission of Exhibits by Michael D. Webb in re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(clar, )
March 11, 2019 Per CMH chambers motions set for 3/15/19 on the pleadings (clar, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued and given to US Marshal for service as to U.S. Merit Systems Protection Board, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pmil, )
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Sealed ORDER APPROVING/GRANTING Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 03/07/19. (c/s: pltf)(pmil, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing on #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (pmil, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Injunctive Relief by Michael D. Webb. (pmil, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION/MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael D. Webb. (pmil, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Merit Systems Protection Board administratively filed by Michael D. Webb., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(pmil, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. U.S. Merit Systems Protection Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major Mike Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Merit Systems Protection Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?