Zimmerman et al v. Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bryan A. Zimmerman and Maria Zkuratovskaya
Defendant: The Williams Companies, Inc. and Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00261
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (dvanm, )
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion for Continuation of Hearing Date and Briefing Deadlines for Motion to Dismiss #18 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED, together with all deadlines referred therein; and the hearing on the Motion currently scheduled for Friday, May 10, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED to Friday, May 31, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/1/2019. (dvanm, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Continue /Hearing Date and Briefing Deadlines for Motion to Dismiss by Bryan A. Zimmerman, Maria Zkuratovskaya. (Harris, Stacey)
April 29, 2019 Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 5/22/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (wgar, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part #16 Motion to Amend/Correct. The initial pretrial conference is continued until Wednesday, May 22, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall submit a joint discovery plan by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, May 15, 2019. No further motions to extend the time to submit the joint discovery plan or to continue the initial pretrial conference will be considered. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 04/29/2019. (wgar, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 Joint MOTION to Continue for Continuance of Motion to Dismiss and Initial Pretrial Conference Deadlines in Light of Impending Settlement Corrected to /Motion for Continuation of Deadlines for Initial Pretrial Conference and Joint Discovery Plan by Bryan A. Zimmerman, Maria Zkuratovskaya. (Harris, Stacey)
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Continue for Continuance of Motion to Dismiss and Initial Pretrial Conference Deadlines in Light of Impending Settlement by Bryan A. Zimmerman, Maria Zkuratovskaya. (Harris, Stacey)
April 10, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (dvanm, )
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Continue. The hearing on the Motion currentlyscheduled for Friday, April 19, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED to Friday, May 10, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 4/10/2019. (dvanm, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue Motion to Dismiss Deadlines in Light of Impending Settlement by Bryan A. Zimmerman, Maria Zkuratovskaya. (Harris, Stacey)
March 21, 2019 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (rban, )
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part #10 Motion for modification of the Scheduling Order. ORDERED the initial pretrial conference is continued until 5/1/2019 at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall submit a joint discovery plan by 5:00 p.m. on 4/24/2019. If necessary, any decision regarding modifying the other dates in the Scheduling Order will be discussed at the initial pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 3/21/2019. (rban, )
March 20, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (dvanm, )
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion to Modify Briefing Deadlines and RescheduleHearing for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Motion currently scheduled for Friday, April 5, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED toFriday, April 19, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/20/2019. (dvanm, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION Modification of Scheduling Order re #7 Scheduling Order, by Bryan A. Zimmerman, Maria Zkuratovskaya. (Harris, Stacey)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION Modify Briefing Deadlines and Reschedule Hearing for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by The Williams Companies, Inc., Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Schmalz, Arthur)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Rose Harris on behalf of Bryan A. Zimmerman, Maria Zkuratovskaya (Harris, Stacey)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. Discovery due by 7/12/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(rban, )
March 13, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 5, 2019 re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Schmalz, Arthur)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 Brief in Support to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Williams Companies, Inc., Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schmalz, Arthur)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Williams Companies, Inc., Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Schmalz, Arthur)
March 5, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by The Williams Companies, Inc.. (Schmalz, Arthur)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Schmalz, Arthur)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6523827.), filed by The Williams Companies, Inc., Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Schmalz, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman et al v. Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan A. Zimmerman
Represented By: Powell L. Duggan
Represented By: Stacey Rose Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Zkuratovskaya
Represented By: Powell L. Duggan
Represented By: Stacey Rose Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Williams Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Eric Schmalz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: Arthur Eric Schmalz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?