Dress v. Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,

Plaintiff: Susan Dress
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,
Case Number: 1:2019cv00343
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 4:18-cv-40064. Original file and docket sheet received.
March 22, 2019 Filing 28 Case Electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Virginia. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 27 Case transferred to to Eastern District of Virginia;. Original file with documents numbered 1-27, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 26 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER entered granting #8 Motion to Transfer Case. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 25 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 1/4/2019 re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A., Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #8 Motion to Transfer Case; (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Gold,Sheehan/Soukup,Samuels,O'Brien) (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia. : Motion Hearing reset for 1/4/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia. Motion Hearing reset for 12/11/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia. Motion Hearing reset for 11/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 21 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion to Continue hearing. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Reschedule Hearing Regarding Motion to Transfer re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia. by CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A.,.(Maya, Michael) Modified on 10/3/2018 (Castles, Martin). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia. : Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2018 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia. filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A.,. (Maya, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 17 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to 14 Days After Court's Ruling on Motion to Transfer to File Answer. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 16 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Leave to File reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to 14 Days After Court's Ruling on Motion to Transfer to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A.,.(Maya, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer by CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Brief)(Maya, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia. Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer filed by Susan Dress. (Sheehan, Patrick) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 12 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nicholas A. Migliaccio; Jason S. Rathod; Jeffrey Kaliel; Susan Goren Gold. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nicholas A. Migliaccio; Jason S. Rathod; Jeffrey Kaliel; Susan Goren Gold Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7161062 by Susan Dress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Migliaccio, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Rathod, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Kaliel, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Gold)(Sheehan, Patrick) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 10 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Andrew Soukup. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia. filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Maya, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia. by CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A.,.(Maya, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew Soukup Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7158192 by CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Maya, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A., identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A.,.. (Maya, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael M. Maya on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A., (Maya, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Susan Dress. CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A., waiver sent on 5/3/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. (Sheehan, Patrick) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A.,. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A., Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7121831 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Susan Dress. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Sheehan, Patrick) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dress v. Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,
Represented By: Andrew Soukup
Represented By: Michael M. Maya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Dress
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Patrick J. Sheehan
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?