Haidari v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: GUL MAKI Haidari
Defendant: Sarah Taylor, District Director,, Jedidah Hussey, Director, USCIS L. Francis CISSNA, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr, Lee Francis Cissna and Sarah Taylor
Case Number: 1:2019cv00546
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay. ORDERED that the instant action is STAYED until further order of this Court. ORDERED that the parties shall file status reports with this Court every sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/24/19. (klau, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay the Proceedings by William Barr, Lee Francis Cissna, Jedidah Hussey, Kevin McAleenan, Sarah Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spavins, Elizabeth)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Spavins on behalf of William Barr, Lee Francis Cissna, Jedidah Hussey, Kevin McAleenan, Sarah Taylor (Spavins, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certified Mail by Gul Maki Haidari as to U.S. Attorney served on 5/16/19, answer due 7/15/19 (Anwari, Deeba) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (klau, ).
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to William Barr (U.S. Attorney General), Lee Francis Cissna, Jedidah Hussey, Kevin McAleenan, Sarah Taylor, U.S. Attorney NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (klau, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Gul Maki Haidari. (Anwari, Deeba)
May 7, 2019 Notice of Correction re [1-3] proposed summons, The filing user has been notified to refile proposed summons separately. (klau, )
May 6, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Lee Francis Cissna, Sarah Taylor, Jedidah Hussey ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6623493.), filed by Gul Maki Haidari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Summons)(Anwari, Deeba) Modified text on 5/6/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haidari v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUL MAKI Haidari
Represented By: Deeba Anwari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Taylor, District Director,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jedidah Hussey
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, USCIS L. Francis CISSNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Taylor
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?