Kelly v City of Alexandria

Plaintiff: ANTHONY KELLY
Defendant: City Of Alexandria
Case Number: 1:2019cv00553
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Hearing Date July 26, 2019 re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Gambino, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 Notice of Correction re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City Of Alexandria. (Gambino, Michelle)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City Of Alexandria. (Gambino, Michelle)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Kelly City Of Alexandria served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019 (Miles, Monique)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to City Of Alexandria. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (rban, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Summons re #9 Amended Complaint by Anthony Kelly. (Miles, Monique)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons re #9 Amended Complaint by Anthony Kelly. (Miles, Monique)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons re #9 Amended Complaint by Anthony Kelly. (Miles, Monique)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City Of Alexandria, filed by Anthony Kelly.(Miles, Monique)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Anthony Kelly. (Miles, Monique)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Anthony Kelly. (Miles, Monique)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Anthony Kelly. (Miles, Monique)
May 8, 2019 Notice of Correction re #4 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that proposed summons are incorrectly saved PDF fillable forms and have been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the documents. (dvanm, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by Anthony Kelly. (Miles, Monique)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Anthony Kelly. (Miles, Monique) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/8/2019) (dvanm, ).
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Anthony Kelly. (Miles, Monique) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/8/2019) (dvanm, ).
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Anthony Kelly. (Miles, Monique) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/8/2019) (dvanm, ).
May 7, 2019 Notice of Correction re Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint. The filing user has been notified that the attachment to the complaint is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (dvanm, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6627105.), filed by ANTHONY KELLY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miles, Monique) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/7/2019) (dvanm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v City of Alexandria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY KELLY
Represented By: Monique Antonia Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Alexandria
Represented By: Michelle DeFinis Gambino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?