Lowe v. Cerner Corporation
Plaintiff: Ruby L. Lowe
Defendant: Cerner Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00625
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo Morales on behalf of Ruby L. Lowe (Morales, Eduardo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 24 Waiver of re #20 Response in Support of Motion, #17 Memorandum in Opposition, #14 Response in Support of Motion Hearing by Ruby L. Lowe (Perry, Scott)
May 22, 2019 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 5:19-cv-00027. Original file and docket sheet received.
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order transferring case to EDVA - Alexandria Divison. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/21/19. (kld) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Virginia (Alexandria Division) by Cerner Corporation. (Dwerlkotte, David) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Cerner Corporation's Reply in Support of It's Suggestions in Support of Motion to Dismiss. filed by Cerner Corporation. (Dwerlkotte, David) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Oral Order directing parties to address the venue issue; dft to file brief within 14 days; pltf will have 14 days to respond. Minutes for Proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Scheduling Conference held on 5/9/2019. (mka) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2019 10:00 AM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Dial in instructions emailed to counsel.(mka) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 17 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss , #14 Response in Support of Motion . filed by Ruby L. Lowe. (Perry, Scott) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michael Perry on behalf of Ruby L. Lowe (Perry, Scott) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Letter (mka) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Cerner Corporation. (Behrens, Mark) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Cerner Corporation. (Behrens, Mark) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney David Brenton Dwerlkotte for Cerner Corporation added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/22/19. (kld) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Amy Marie Crouch for Cerner Corporation added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/22/19. (kld) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Amy M. Crouch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3124535. by Cerner Corporation. (Behrens, Mark) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for David Brent Dwerlkotte to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3124494. by Cerner Corporation. (Behrens, Mark) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Oral ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/26/2019.. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/15/19. (mka) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Paper State Court Records received from Clarke County Circuit Court, CL 18004607-00, consisting of 1 Legal Sized Envelope with documents inside, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (Attachments: #1 complaint as filed in Clarke County Circuit Court, #2 First amended complaint as filed in Clarke County Circuit Court, #3 Pleadings as filed in Clarke County Circuit Court, #4 Notice of Removal as filed in Clarke County Circuit Court and USDC WDVA)(jv) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Cerner Corporation's Unopposed Motion For An Extension Of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Cerner Corporation. (Behrens, Mark) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jv) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cerner Corporation (Behrens, Mark) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Requirement to Cerner Corporation - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (kld) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Clarke County. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/5/19. (kld) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clarke County Circuit Court, case number CL 18004607-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400), receipt #0423-3114501 filed by Cerner Corporation. (Attachments: #1 state court documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kld) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowe v. Cerner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Corporation
Represented By: Amy Marie Crouch
Represented By: Mark A. Behrens
Represented By: David Brenton Dwerlkotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby L. Lowe
Represented By: Anastasia Uzilevskaya
Represented By: Mikhael David Charnoff
Represented By: Scott Michael Perry
Represented By: Eduardo Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?