Parker v. Southern Tower Apartments LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ray Elbert Parker
Defendant: Virginia Management, Inc., Caruthers Properties, LLC, Yaw Opuku-Boakye and Southern Tower Apartments LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00657
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 So Ordered re: #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice filed by Ray Elbert Parker. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 06/17/19. (pmil, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ray Elbert Parker (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(pmil, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing for 06/12/19 at 10:00 a.m. re: Pltf's #11 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (PLTF TOLD TO FILE CORRECTED NOTICE OF HEARING) (pmil, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Ray Elbert Parker. (pmil, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Pltf's #11 Opposition filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (pmil, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 Opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order)(pmil, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants' Proposed Discovery Plan by Caruthers Properties, LLC, Southern Tower Apartments LLC, Virginia Management, Inc., Yaw Opuku-Boakye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Pak, Yoora)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Parker's #6 Motion to Remand Back to Circuit Court for City of Alexandria be and is DENIED (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 06/11/19. (copy mailed to pltf) (pmil, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 PRAECIPE/Waiver of Hearing re: #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ray Elbert Parker (pmil, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (pmil, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand Back to Circuit Court for City of Alexandria by Ray Elbert Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order)(pmil, )
June 5, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Hearing Date July 12, 2019 re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. (Pak, Yoora)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Caruthers Properties, LLC, Southern Tower Apartments LLC, Virginia Management, Inc., Yaw Opuku-Boakye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Pak, Yoora)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Caruthers Properties, LLC, Southern Tower Apartments LLC, Virginia Management, Inc., Yaw Opuku-Boakye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Discovery due by 10/11/2019. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(rban, )
May 28, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (jlan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal with CCS ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6661706.), filed by Yaw Opuku-Boakye, Southern Tower Apartments LLC, Caruthers Properties, LLC, Virginia Management, Inc., Ray Elbert Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Pak, Yoora)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Southern Tower Apartments LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Management, Inc.
Represented By: Yoora Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caruthers Properties, LLC
Represented By: Yoora Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaw Opuku-Boakye
Represented By: Yoora Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Tower Apartments LLC
Represented By: Yoora Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Elbert Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?