Worku v. Gershem et al
Plaintiff: Menilik Worku
Defendant: AMIP Management, Kim R. Gershem and FCI Lender Services Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00681
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Sealed Document regarding filing fee. (dvanm, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; directing Plaintiff may refile his motion after the Defendants in this action have been served. If Plaintiff chooses to refile his motion, Plaintiff should explain why he believes he is entitles to a temporary restraining order under the four factors set forth in this order. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 06/21/2019. (choy, c/m 06/21/2019 )
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued, via SPS, as to AMIP Management, Kim R. Gershem. (dvanm, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (dvanm, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Non-Judicial Temporary Restraining Order - Permanent-Injunction & Demand for an Emergency Hearing because of the pending lawsuit by Menilik Worku. (dvanm, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMIP Management, FCI Lender Services Inc., Kim R. Gershem ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683078902.), filed by Menilik Worku. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Receipt)(dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worku v. Gershem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Menilik Worku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMIP Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim R. Gershem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI Lender Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?