Continental Insurance Company et al v HVAC Investigators, LLC
Plaintiff: Transportation Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford and Continental Insurance Company
Defendant: HVAC Investigators, LLC, Michael HYNES and HYNES HVAC, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00711
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 25 JOINT Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Continental Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Amended Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #23 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for August 7, 2019, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's June 24, 2019 Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 07/29/2019. (lgue, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 23 Amended Joint Rule 26(f) Proposed Discovery Plan by HVAC Investigators, LLC.(Jones, Gary)
July 25, 2019 Filing 22 Joint Rule 26(f) Proposed Discovery Plan by HVAC Investigators, LLC.(Jones, Gary)
July 25, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Hynes HVAC, LLC c/o M Hynes R.A. on 07/09/2019, filed by Continental Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Michael Hynes on 07/09/2019, filed by Continental Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by HVAC Investigators, LLC.(Nanavati, Mark)
July 5, 2019 Filing 18 Amended Complaint SUMMONS Issued as to Michael HYNES, HYNES HVAC, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Summons re #15 Amended Complaint upon Hynes HVAC, LLC by Continental Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Summons re #15 Amended Complaint upon Michael Hynes by Continental Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Continental Insurance Company.(Rosenblum, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION to file Amended Complaint by Continental Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by HVAC Investigators, LLC of Subpoena Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Subpoena))(Jones, Gary)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 06/25/2019. (dvanm, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Francis Noone and Certification of Local Counsel David Rosenblum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6709920. by Continental Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Discovery due by 12/9/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (if the parties do not file dispositive motions). Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (if the parties do file dispositive motions). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 06/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(tran)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by HVAC Investigators, LLC. (Nanavati, Mark)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by HVAC Investigators, LLC.(Nanavati, Mark)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Corporation Service Company, R.A on 06/07/2019, filed by Continental Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to HVAC Investigators, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
June 3, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Transportation Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Rosenblum, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Continental Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6670306.), filed by Continental Insurance Company, Transportation Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenblum, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 Proposed Summons by Continental Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Transportation Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Insurance Company et al v HVAC Investigators, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transportation Insurance Company
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HVAC Investigators, LLC
Represented By: Mark Charles Nanavati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael HYNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYNES HVAC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?