Myer v. Poston et al
Plaintiff: Glenn Myer
Defendant: Bruce White and Charles Poston
Case Number: 1:2019cv00713
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 USCA Case Number 19-1640 4th Circuit, T. Fischer, Case Manager for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Glenn Myer. (acha, )
June 13, 2019 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #6 Notice of Appeal (dvanm, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (dvanm, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order Dismissing Case, by Glenn Myer. (dvanm, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 be, and the same hereby is, CONDITIONALLY GRANTED; that Plaintiff's Complaint #1 be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; See Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/12/2019. (rban, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (dvanm, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Glenn Myer. (dvanm, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Glenn Myer. (dvanm, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Poston, Bruce White, filed by Glenn Myer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myer v. Poston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Myer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Poston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?