American Tire Distributors, Inc. v. Retail Express North, Inc.
Plaintiff: American Tire Distributors, Inc.
Defendant: Retail Express North, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00718
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 01:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. Discovery due by 12/13/2019.. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(awac, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Retail Express North, Inc.. (Young, Warner)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Retail Express North, Inc..(Young, Warner)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Warner Franklin Young, III on behalf of Retail Express North, Inc. (Young, Warner)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Tire Distributors, Inc. Retail Express North, Inc. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 (Cooper, Massie)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Retail Express North, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
June 5, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (jlan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Tire Distributors, Inc.. (Cooper, Massie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by American Tire Distributors, Inc.. (Cooper, Massie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6674988.), filed by American Tire Distributors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease, #2 Exhibit B - Sublease, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooper, Massie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Tire Distributors, Inc. v. Retail Express North, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retail Express North, Inc.
Represented By: Warner Franklin Young, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Tire Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Massie Payne Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?