McCallum v. Fairfax County Department of Public Works and Environmental Services
Plaintiff: Willie A. McCallum
Defendant: Fairfax County Department of Public Works and Environmental Services and COUNTY OF FAIRFAX, VIRGINIA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00724
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that the re #15 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that the re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/1/2019. (lcre, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process filed by Willie A. McCallum. (Zhang, Ziran)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Willie A. McCallum. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zhang, Ziran)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against COUNTY OF FAIRFAX, VIRGINIA, filed by Willie A. McCallum.(Zhang, Ziran)
July 22, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Hearing Date set for August 16, 2019 re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process (Hardy, Robert)
July 18, 2019 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process (lcre, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(rban, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Brief in Support to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process filed by Fairfax County Department of Public Works and Environmental Services. (Hardy, Robert)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process by Fairfax County Department of Public Works and Environmental Services. (Hardy, Robert)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sarah Caitlyn Aviles and Thomas Mansfield Dunlap terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 6/20/2019. (lcre, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Willie A. McCallum. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aviles, Sarah)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ziran Zhang on behalf of Willie A. McCallum (Zhang, Ziran)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 06/10/2019. (dvanm, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Caitlyn Aviles on behalf of Willie A. McCallum (Aviles, Sarah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Algernon Marques Pitre and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas M. Dunlap by Willie A. McCallum. (Dunlap, Thomas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fairfax County Department of Public Works and Environmental Services. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(aott)
June 7, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (aott)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Willie A. McCallum. (Dunlap, Thomas)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6678794.), filed by Willie A. McCallum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunlap, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCallum v. Fairfax County Department of Public Works and Environmental Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie A. McCallum
Represented By: Thomas Mansfield Dunlap
Represented By: Ziran Zhang
Represented By: Sarah Caitlyn Aviles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfax County Department of Public Works and Environmental Services
Represented By: Robert Mccay Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF FAIRFAX, VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?