Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC v. Green Paradise Enterprises, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC
Defendant: Junghoon Samuel Kim, Green Paradise, LLC, Lydia Lee and Green Paradise Enterprises, Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00749
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDERED that Plaintiff file a motion for default judgment and an accompanying memorandum setting forth the factual and legal support for findings. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 08/01/2019. (see order for details)(dvanm, ) Modified on 8/1/2019 (dvanm, ).
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lydia Lee. (acha, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Entry of Default as to Lydia Lee by Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Surbey, Blake)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Green Paradise Enterprises, Corp., Green Paradise, LLC. (acha, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Entry of Default as to Defendants Green Paradise Enterprises, Corp. and Green Paradise, LLC a/t/a New Grand Mart by Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Surbey, Blake)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 Mail sent to Junghoon Samuel Kim DE #11 Returned as Undeliverable. (acha, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC Lydia Lee served on 6/16/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 (Surbey, Blake)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 So Ordered re #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/19/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copies sent as directed in the order.
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC Green Paradise, LLC served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 (Surbey, Blake)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC Green Paradise Enterprises, Corp. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 (Surbey, Blake)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Junghoon Samuel Kim, only by Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC (Surbey, Blake)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC. (Surbey, Blake)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Green Paradise Enterprises, Corp., Green Paradise, LLC, Junghoon Samuel Kim, Lydia Lee. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
June 7, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (acha, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Junghoon Samuel Kim by Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC. (Surbey, Blake)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Lydia Lee by Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC. (Surbey, Blake)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Green Paradise, LLC by Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC. (Surbey, Blake)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Green Paradise Enterprises, Corp. by Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC. (Surbey, Blake)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6680449.), filed by Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1_Coastal PACA License, #2 Exhibit Ex 2_Green Paradise PACA License, #3 Exhibit Ex 3_Personal Guarantees, #4 Exhibit Ex 4_Stmt of Acct for Green Paradise, #5 Exhibit Ex 5_Stmt of Acct for New Grand Mart, #6 Exhibit Ex 6_Invoices for Green Paradise, #7 Exhibit Ex 7_Invoices for New Grand Mart, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Surbey, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC v. Green Paradise Enterprises, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junghoon Samuel Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Paradise, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydia Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Paradise Enterprises, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC
Represented By: Blake Alan Surbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?