Malibu Media, LLC. v. Doe

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC.
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00811
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 06/24/2019. (see order for details/changes) (dvanm, )
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/20/2019. (rban, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Report on the filing of an action regarding copyright- See Attached. Mailed to the Copyright Office, Washington, DC 20559. (acha, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (FILED IN CLERK'S ERROR) - ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 6/19/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Modified on 6/24/2019 (dvanm, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Hoppe and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Decker, II Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6697632. by Malibu Media, LLC.. (Decker, John)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC. of Action Regarding Copyright (Decker, John)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of re #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Malibu Media, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC.. (Decker, John)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Damages for Property Rights Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6697543.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC. v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC.
Represented By: John Carlin Decker, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?