Cleaves v. INOVA Health Care Services
Plaintiff: Christine Cleaves
Defendant: INOVA Health Care Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00817
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 38:4301Right
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for 8/7/2019, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's 7/16/2019 Order is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 7/31/2019. (rban, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by INOVA Health Care Services.(Kirkland, Laurie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by INOVA Health Care Services. (Kirkland, Laurie)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by INOVA Health Care Services.(Kirkland, Laurie)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Notice, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet served on Katie Bush on 06/24/2019, filed by Christine Cleaves. (Rawls, Brewster)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 07/03/19. (pmil, )
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 07/03/19. (pmil, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen J. Matcha and Certification of Local Counsel Brewster S. Rawls Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6718284. by Christine Cleaves. (Rawls, Brewster)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Joseph Lawler and Certification of Local Counsel Brewster S. Rawls Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6718227. by Christine Cleaves. (Rawls, Brewster) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/1/2019) (klau, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to INOVA Health Care Services. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
June 19, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (pmil, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Christine Cleaves. (Rawls, Brewster)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6698688.), filed by Christine Cleaves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rawls, Brewster)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleaves v. INOVA Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INOVA Health Care Services
Represented By: Laurie Lea Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Cleaves
Represented By: Brewster Stone Rawls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?