Clayton v. Unknown

Plaintiff: Ervin Clayton
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 1:2019cv00825
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that this action be and is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If Clayton wishes to appeal this decision, he must file a written notice of appeal with the Clerk's Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/30/2019. (See order for further details)(choy, )(Copies mailed to Pro-Se Petitioner)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to the Court from Ervin Clayton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to the Court from Ervin Clayton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (choy, c/m 06/21/2019 )
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown, filed by Ervin Clayton. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Database, #2 Envelope)(choy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?