Morris, III v. Judge Gordon F. Willis et al

Plaintiff: Charles R. Morris, III
Defendant: Jeff Small and Judge Gordon F. Willis
Case Number: 1:2019cv00833
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may resubmit his claims in a 28 U.S.C. 2254 petition after he has exhausted them at the Supreme Court of Virginia. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 07/09/2019. (c/m)(dvanm, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION of Acknowledgement Receipt by Charles R. Morris, III. (dvanm, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (lcre, )(c/s to Plaintiff)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles R. Morris, III. (lcre, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Judge Gordon F. Willis, Jeff Small (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Charles R. Morris, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Prisoner Data Report)(lcre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris, III v. Judge Gordon F. Willis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Gordon F. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Morris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?