Lopez v. Jang-Won Restaurant, Inc.
Plaintiff: Juan Garcia Lopez and Moris Paz
Defendant: Jang-Won Restaurant, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00836
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Jang-Won Restaurant, Inc.. (Miller, Zachary)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Jang-Won Restaurant, Inc..(Miller, Zachary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jang-Won Restaurant, Inc., filed by Juan Garcia Lopez, Moris Paz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline First Amended Complaint)(Greenberg, Gregg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Garcia Lopez as to Jang-Won Restaurant, Inc. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 (Greenberg, Gregg) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (klau, ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jang-Won Restaurant, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
June 21, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (acha, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6704578.), filed by Juan Garcia Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons)(Greenberg, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Jang-Won Restaurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jang-Won Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Garcia Lopez
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moris Paz
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?