Allstate Insurance Company v. Eggar et al
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., Stronghold Insurance LLC, 971i LLC, Justin Eggar, Songsong Shi and J & J Insurance LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00841
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1831
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff:Settlement Conference held on 11/25/2019. There were seven (7) attendees. Conference lasted approximately 3 hours and 45 minutes. (cmar, )
October 30, 2019 Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 11/25/2019 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (cmar, )
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. #83 ). Having reviewed the Motion, and for the reasons stated from the bench, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice at this time. The parties are directed to confer with regard to an appropriate timeframe for substantial completion of production of discovery, which shall start on a rolling basis within seven (7) days. Counsel are further directed to advise the Court on the schedule for production of documents and available dates for a settlement conference in November by close of business on Tuesday, October 29, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/25/19. (cmar, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff:Motion Hearing held on 10/25/2019 re #83 MOTION to Compel filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and DENIED without prejudice. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(cmar, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 MOTION to Compel filed by Justin Eggar, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Songsong Shi, Stronghold Insurance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Ex. F, #8 Exhibit Ex. G, #9 Exhibit Ex. H)(Dyson, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 86 ANSWER to Counterclaim by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
October 18, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Nachmanoff. #83 MOTION to Compel (clar, )
October 18, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #83 MOTION to Compel . Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (clar, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 85 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 25, 2019 re #84 Memorandum in Support, #83 MOTION to Compel (Billings-Kang, James)
October 17, 2019 Filing 84 Memorandum in Support re #83 MOTION to Compel filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Proposed Order Ex. L)(Billings-Kang, James)
October 17, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION to Compel by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART without prejudice. Accordingly it is herebyORDERED that Count VIII be and is DISMISSED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties appear before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff for a settlement conference. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/11/19. (yguy)
October 11, 2019 Filing 81 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2019. Appearances of counsel. Defts #68 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is argued and GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Parties directed to schedule mediation/settlement meeting with magistrate judge. (order to follow) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
October 9, 2019 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Memorandum in Support), #68 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #67 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Notice of Hearing) filed by Justin Eggar, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Songsong Shi, Stronghold Insurance LLC. (Dyson, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Based on the parties' representations in their discovery plan, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 9, 2019 shall be canceled. Upon review of the pleadings and the record, the court makes the following rulings: 1. The Rule 26(f) report (Dkt. No. #76 ) filed by the parties is approved unless modified by the court herein or hereafter. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/08/19. (cmar, )
October 3, 2019 Per MSN chambers the pretrial conference scheduled for 10/9/19 has been cancelled (clar, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Joseph LaPlaca on behalf of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY (LaPlaca, Anthony)
October 1, 2019 Filing 76 Rule 26(f) Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Billings-Kang, James)
September 27, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #68 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDERED that this motion #31 be and is DENIED as moot; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to vacate hearing on this motion #74 be and is GRANTED. Because the defendant's Motion to Dismiss is still noticed for argument on October 11, 2019, that hearing will go forward on October 11, 2019. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 09/27/2019. (dvanm, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 74 Withdrawal of Motion by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY re #31 Emergency MOTION Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, MOTION for Discovery (Billings-Kang, James)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER of Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 09/23/2019. (dvanm, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY re #65 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Proposed Stipulated Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Billings-Kang, James)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 70 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #64 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UNDER SEAL Ex. C, #2 Exhibit UNDER SEAL Ex. D, #3 Exhibit UNDER SEAL Ex. E)(Dyson, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 69 Memorandum in Support of #68 Motion to Dismiss by Justin Eggar, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Songsong Shi, Stronghold Insurance LLC. (Dyson, Michael) Modified to correct text on 9/27/2019 (dvanm, ).
September 18, 2019 Filing 68 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Justin Eggar, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Songsong Shi, Stronghold Insurance LLC. (Dyson, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 67 Notice of Hearing re: Motion to Dismiss #68 by Justin Eggar, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Songsong Shi, Stronghold Insurance LLC. (Dyson, Michael) Modified to correct text on 9/27/2019 (dvanm, ).
September 18, 2019 Filing 66 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by Justin Eggar, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Songsong Shi, Stronghold Insurance LLC re #64 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Exhibits C, D, and E (Dyson, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY of Filing of Proposed Stipulated Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Billings-Kang, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 64 Defendants' Verified ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Stronghold Insurance LLC, Songsong Shi, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, J & J Insurance LLC, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., Justin Eggar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. F)(Dyson, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 63 STIPULATION filed by 971i LLC, Justin Eggar, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Songsong Shi, Stronghold Insurance LLC. (Dyson, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDERED that defendants advise the court, no later than September 11, 2019, whether they wish to proceed on their pending motion to dismiss or, alternatively, whether given the amended complaint they wish to have their pending motion to dismiss denied without prejudice to their filing a new motion to dismiss. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 09/05/2019. (dvanm, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #56 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 09/04/2019. (see order for details) (dvanm, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY re #56 Emergency MOTION to Seal Documents Containing Trade Secret Information (Exhibits C, D, and E to Defendants' Verified Answer and Counterclaims) Praecipe Regarding Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Billings-Kang, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 59 Notice of Hearing Date set for 9/13/2019 re #57 Memorandum in Support,,, #56 Emergency MOTION to Seal Documents Containing Trade Secret Information (Exhibits C, D, and E to Defendants' Verified Answer and Counterclaims), #58 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C), (Billings-Kang, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 58 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY re #57 Memorandum in Support,,, #55 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, #56 Emergency MOTION to Seal Documents Containing Trade Secret Information (Exhibits C, D, and E to Defendants' Verified Answer and Counterclaims) (Billings-Kang, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 57 Memorandum in Support re #56 Emergency MOTION to Seal Documents Containing Trade Secret Information (Exhibits C, D, and E to Defendants' Verified Answer and Counterclaims) , Memorandum filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Billings-Kang, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 56 Emergency MOTION to Seal Documents Containing Trade Secret Information (Exhibits C, D, and E to Defendants' Verified Answer and Counterclaims) by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Billings-Kang, James)
September 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (dvanm, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 55 Defendants' Verified ANSWER to Complaint Verified, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Songsong Shi, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Justin Eggar, Stronghold Insurance LLC, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Dyson, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND OTHER RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Billings-Kang, James)
August 30, 2019 Filing 53 Memorandum in Support of #52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Justin Eggar, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Songsong Shi, Stronghold Insurance LLC. (Dyson, Michael) Modified on 8/30/2019 (dvanm, ).
August 30, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Justin Eggar, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Songsong Shi, Stronghold Insurance LLC. (Dyson, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF HEARING re: MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Justin Eggar, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Songsong Shi, Stronghold Insurance LLC. (Dyson, Michael) Modified on 8/30/2019 (dvanm, ).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDERED that all defendants must file an answer or responsive pleading no later than close of business on Friday, August 30, 2019. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 08/21/2019. (dvanm, c/m 8/21/2019)
August 8, 2019 Reset hearing as to #31 Emergency MOTION Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, MOTION for Discovery . Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (aott, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Joint Motion for Continuance of Hearing on Expedited Discovery ; directing that the August 9, 2019 hearing on #31 Allstate's contempt motion is continued until Friday October 11, 2019 at 10:00 am in Alexandria Courtroom 700 and the parties shall submit any supplemental briefing by October 4, 2019. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/8/2019. (aott, )
August 8, 2019 Per LMB Chamber motion set for 8/9/19 is taken off. (klau, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 48 Joint MOTION to Continue August 9, 2019 Hearing, Joint MOTION for Hearing re #42 Order,, #31 Emergency MOTION Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, MOTION for Discovery , #43 Opposition,, #41 Status Conference,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, #32 Memorandum in Support,, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Billings-Kang, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 47 Redacted version of Exhibit 10 to #32 Memorandum in Support re 31 Emergency MOTION Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re 28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, MOTION for Discovery filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (aott)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #44 Unopposed Motion to Replace Exhibit ; directing that clerk to place under seal exhibit 10 to the Declaration of J. Scott Humphrey (ecf 32-9) and replace it on the public docket with the redacted version of exhibit 10. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/8/2019. (aott)
August 7, 2019 Filing 45 Waiver of re #44 MOTION Replace Exhibit re #32 Memorandum in Support, Waiver of Hearing by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Billings-Kang, James)
August 7, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION Replace Exhibit re #32 Memorandum in Support, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Billings-Kang, James)
August 6, 2019 Filing 43 Opposition to #31 Emergency MOTION Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, MOTION for Discovery filed by Justin Eggar, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Songsong Shi, Stronghold Insurance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Affidavit, #12 Affidavit, #13 Exhibit)(Dyson, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants' opposition to plaintiffs motion for expedited discovery[Dkt. No. 31]' must be filed by close of business on Tuesday, August 6, 2019; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs reply must be filed by 12:00 PM on Thursday, August 8, 2019; and it is further ORDERED that the parties appear for oral argument on plaintiffs request for expedited discovery on Friday, August 9, 2019, at 9:30 AM. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/1/19. (yguy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Status Conference held on 8/1/2019. Appearances of counsel. Court advised of case status. Court cautions deft regarding any activities that suggests files are being destroyed. Court advises parties to try to work things out. Deft has until close of business 8/6/19 to file response to motion re: request for expedited discovery. Pltf has until noon 8/8/19 to file reply. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2019 at 09:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 40 EXHIBIT to Declaration of J. Scott Humphrey in Support of Emergency Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Billings-Kang, James)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying #38 Motion for Electronic Device Application. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/31/2019. (dvanm, ) (Main Document 39 replaced on 8/7/2019) (dvanm, ).
July 31, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Electronic Device Application by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
July 31, 2019 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (dvanm, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - Allstate's motion for an order shortening time for a hearing #34 is DENIED, the hearing noticed for Allstate's Motion #33 is CANCELLED, and it is hereby ORDERED that the parties appear for the scheduled status conference on Thursday, August 1, 2019, at 10:00 AM. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/31/2019. (dvanm, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Companys Emergency Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re Set/Reset Hearings, #31 Emergency MOTION Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re #28 Order on Motion f filed by Justin Eggar, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Songsong Shi, Stronghold Insurance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dyson, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Hearing Date set for August 1, 2019 re Set/Reset Hearings, #31 Emergency MOTION Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, MOTION for Discovery , #34 MOTION Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Companys Emergency Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re Set/Reset Hearings, #31 Emergency MOTION Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re #28 Order on Motion f, #32 Memorandum in Support, (Billings-Kang, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Companys Emergency Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re Set/Reset Hearings, #31 Emergency MOTION Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, MOTION for Discovery , #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, #32 Memorandum in Support, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Billings-Kang, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Hearing Date set for August 1, 2019 re Set/Reset Hearings, #31 Emergency MOTION Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, MOTION for Discovery , #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, #32 Memorandum in Support, (Billings-Kang, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 32 Memorandum in Support re #31 Emergency MOTION Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, MOTION for Discovery filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Billings-Kang, James) Redacted Version of [32-9] (Exhibit 10) filed at ECF #47 Modified on 8/8/2019 (aott, ).
July 26, 2019 Filing 31 Emergency MOTION Motion for Contempt and Expedited Discovery re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, , MOTION for Discovery by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Billings-Kang, James)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/05/2019. (dvanm, )
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/05/2019. (dvanm, )
July 3, 2019 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (dvanm, )
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. It is FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the hearing currently set for 10:00 a.m. on July 5, 2019, is VACATED. The Parties shall appear before this Court for aStatus Conference on Thursday, August 1, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. regarding issues related to the Parties' ongoing efforts to ensure the return or deletion of all Allstate confidential information, if any, in the possession, custody or control of Defendants. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/03/2019. (dvanm, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Desiree Furman Moore and Certification of Local Counsel Michael T. Dyson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6722097. by 971i LLC. (Dyson, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Beth Bivans Petronio and Certification of Local Counsel Michael T. Dyson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6722051. by 971i LLC. (Dyson, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Parties, Joint MOTION for Hearing re #17 Notice of Hearing Date, #14 Notice of Hearing Date, #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #15 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery and to Preserve Evidence by All Parties by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Preliminary Injunction and Status Conference)(Billings-Kang, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY All Defendants (Billings-Kang, James)
June 28, 2019 Notice of Correction re #23 Affidavit of Service. Filing user notified to file actual proof of service. (dvanm, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (and supporting memorandum), Notice of Hearing, Emergency Motion for Expedited Discovery and to Preserve Evidence (and supporting memorandum), Notice of Hearing served on All Defendants on 6/26/2019, filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Billings-Kang, James)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/26/2019. (rban, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 06/25/2019. (dvanm, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 06/25/2019. (dvanm, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to 971i LLC, Justin Eggar, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc., J & J Insurance LLC, Pro Shield Financial, LLC, Songsong Shi, Stronghold Insurance LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Katelyn R. Miller and Certification of Local Counsel James R. Billings-Kang Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6708572. by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
June 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #15 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery and to Preserve Evidence, #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
June 24, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Hearing Date July 5, 2019 or as soon as counsel may be heard re #16 Memorandum in Support, #15 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery and to Preserve Evidence (Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery and to Preserve Evidence filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery and to Preserve Evidence by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Hearing Date July 5, 2019 or as soon as counsel may be heard re #13 Memorandum in Support, #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Erik W. Weibust and Certification of Local Counsel James R. Billings-Kang Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6706375. by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Scott Humphrey and Certification of Local Counsel James R. Billings-Kang Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6706370. by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Justin Eggar by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Songsong Jeff Shi by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Eggar Insurance Services, Inc. by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, J & J Insurance LLC by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Stronghold Insurance LLC by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Pro Shield Financial, LLC by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, 971i LLC by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Billings-Kang, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Verified Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6706140.), filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Billings-Kang, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Eggar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Shield Financial, LLC
Represented By: Michael T. Dyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eggar Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Dyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stronghold Insurance LLC
Represented By: Michael T. Dyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 971i LLC
Represented By: Michael T. Dyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Eggar
Represented By: Michael T. Dyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Songsong Shi
Represented By: Michael T. Dyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J Insurance LLC
Represented By: Michael T. Dyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: James Robert Billings-Kang
Represented By: Anthony Joseph LaPlaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?