Abdelhalim v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Nagla Abdelhalim
Defendant: Armistead Park Homeowners Association, Andrew McDevitt, Dinara Lewis, Aaron Lewis and Roxana McDevitt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00858
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. 21), and taking note of the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 18) entered in this case, the Court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by Friday, December 13, 2019. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. 3. The pretrial conference scheduled for Wednesday, August 28, 2019, at 1 1:00 a.m. is cancelled. 4. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by September 3, 2019. 5. No "general objection" may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. (see Order for details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 8/21/19. (tfitz, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Armistead Park Homeowners Association. (Schubert, Martin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 Reply to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Armistead Park Homeowners Association. (Schubert, Martin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 Opposition to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nagla Abdelhalim. (Hantzes, Nicholas)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 01:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. Discovery due by 12/13/2019.. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(awac, )
July 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Andrew McDevitt, Roxana McDevitt.(Kay, Douglas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Dinara Lewis.(Francuzenko, Alexander)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Aaron Lewis.(Francuzenko, Alexander)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Francuzenko on behalf of Aaron Lewis, Dinara Lewis (Francuzenko, Alexander)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Arena on behalf of Aaron Lewis, Dinara Lewis (Arena, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Hearing Date re #11 Memorandum in Support, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Schubert, Martin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Armistead Park Homeowners Association. (Schubert, Martin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Armistead Park Homeowners Association. (Schubert, Martin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armistead Park Homeowners Association. (Schubert, Martin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Schubert on behalf of Armistead Park Homeowners Association (Schubert, Martin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT Returned Executed as to Armstead Park HOA served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/19, filed by Nagla Abdelhalim. (Hantzes, Nicholas) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (klau, ).
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT Returned Executed as to Aaron Lewis served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/19, filed by Nagla Abdelhalim. (Hantzes, Nicholas) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (klau, ).
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT Returned Executed as to Dinara Lewis served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/19 filed by Nagla Abdelhalim. (Hantzes, Nicholas) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (klau, ).
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT Returned Executed as to Roxana McDevitt served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/19, filed by Nagla Abdelhalim. (Hantzes, Nicholas) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (klau, ).
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT Returned Executed as to Andrew McDevitt served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/19 filed by Nagla Abdelhalim. (Hantzes, Nicholas) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (klau, ).
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Armistead Park Homeowners Association, Aaron Lewis, Dinara Lewis, Andrew McDevitt, Roxana McDevitt. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
June 27, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (jlan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6713196.), filed by Nagla Abdelhalim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Hantzes, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdelhalim v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armistead Park Homeowners Association
Represented By: Martin Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew McDevitt
Represented By: Douglas R. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinara Lewis
Represented By: Alexander Francuzenko
Represented By: Michael David Arena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Lewis
Represented By: Alexander Francuzenko
Represented By: Michael David Arena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxana McDevitt
Represented By: Douglas R. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Nagla Abdelhalim
Represented By: Nicholas H. Hantzes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?