Zaire v. Episcopal High School
Plaintiff: Fiji Zaire
Defendant: Episcopal High School
Case Number: 1:2019cv00873
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Episcopal High School. (Calamis, Nat)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Date re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #14 Memorandum in Support, (Calamis, Nat)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Episcopal High School. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Calamis, Nat)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Episcopal High School. (Calamis, Nat)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Pltf's First Amended Complaint; Deft shall file a responsive pleading on or before 08/26/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 08/07/19. (pmil, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Episcopal High School. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Conkright, Sarah)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Wood Conkright on behalf of Episcopal High School (Conkright, Sarah)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nat Peter Calamis on behalf of Episcopal High School (Calamis, Nat)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Wood Conkright on behalf of Episcopal High School (Conkright, Sarah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons for Amended Complaint Issued as to Episcopal High School. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #3 Amended Complaint by Fiji Zaire. (Miles, Monique)
July 23, 2019 Notice of Correction re #5 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that document #5 has an incorrectly named clerk of court and has been removed. The filing user was directed to correct and refile the document. (dvanm, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #3 Amended Complaint by Fiji Zaire. (Miles, Monique) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/23/2019) (dvanm, ).
July 22, 2019 Notice of Correction re #4 Proposed Summons. Filing user has been notified that a summons cannot be sent to a party not named in the complaint or amended complaint. Asked to correct and refile. (dvanm, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #3 Amended Complaint by Fiji Zaire. (Miles, Monique)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Episcopal High School, filed by Fiji Zaire.(Miles, Monique)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by Fiji Zaire. (Miles, Monique)
July 1, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. Filing user notified to file a Civil Cover Sheet. (dvanm, )
June 28, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dvanm, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6716660.), filed by Fiji Zaire.(Miles, Monique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaire v. Episcopal High School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Episcopal High School
Represented By: Nat Peter Calamis
Represented By: Sarah Wood Conkright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiji Zaire
Represented By: Monique Antonia Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?