Jennette et al v. Givons-Davis et al

Plaintiff: Robert Henry and alvena jennette
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites of Frederiksburg LLC, Nancy Givons-Davis, Platinum Property Management LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Woodbridge LLC, kevin davis, Salon Suites of Barracks Rd., LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Waverly LLC, Salon Suites of Hampton LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Virginia Beach LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at One Loudon LLC, Salon Suites at Plantation Point LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Davis Ford Crossing LLC, Salon Suites at Federal Hill LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Springfield LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Patterson Place LLC, Salon Suites at Franklin LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Chesapeke LLC, Phenix Bicoastal Salons LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Short Pump LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Southpark LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Mooresville LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Cary LLC and Phenix Salon Suites of Roanoke LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00904
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:45
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/31/2019. (rban, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 46 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Wesley M. Mullen and Certification of Local Counsel Pierce C. Murphy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6758374. by kevin davis. (Murphy, Pierce)
July 25, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint by kevin davis.(Murphy, Pierce)
July 11, 2019 Filing 44 DOCUMENT DELETED. DUPLICATE ENTRY OF NUMBER 43.
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that defendant answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' Amended Complaint within 14 days from the date of this Order, and it is further ORDERED that for New York counsel to continue to represent the defendant, they must associate with local counsel admitted to practice in this District. If the defendant does not have counsel admitted to practice in this District, he may represent himself pro se. but he will have to comply with all local rules as well as the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Evidence. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/11/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )Copies forwarded as directed in the order.
July 11, 2019 Filing 42 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-02291. Original file and docket sheet received.
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, granting #35 Motion to Change Venue; Case transferred to District of Virginia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.; For the foregoing reasons, the court grants defendant's motion. The Eastern District of Virginia is a proper and more convenient venue for this case. The Clerk ofCourt is respectfully directed to transfer the case to the Eastern District of Virginia. (Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 7/10/2019) C/M (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENDORSED LETTER ORDER granting #39 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Status \ Settlement Conference is adjourned to 8/21/2019 @ 2:00 PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/13/2019. (Caggiano, Diana) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 39 Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Extend Discovery Deadline by Kevin Davis. (Mullen, Wesley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
April 4, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY for Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/4/2019. Appearances: Kathleen Julian for plaintiffs, Wesley Mullen for defendants. Settlement discussions continue. Discovery to proceed absent a stay from the District Court. Mandatory disclosures due 4/26/2019. Document requests and interrogatories due 5/17/2019, responses due 6/17/2019. Status/Settlement Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. (Graham, Emily) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY in Support re #35 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Virginia filed by Kevin Davis. (Mullen, Wesley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #37 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Settlement Conference adjourned to 4/4/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/5/2019. (Graham, Emily) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 37 Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference set for March 6 by Kevin Davis. (Mullen, Wesley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Virginia filed by Robert Henry, Alvena Jennette. (Julian, Kathleen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
February 5, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 2/5/2019. Appearance for Plaintiff: Kathleen F. Julian. Appearance for Defendant: Wesley Martin Mullen. Plaintiff's response to motion due 3/1/2019 - reply 3/15/2019. Plaintiff to convey demand; settlement conference set for 3/6/2019 @ 12:00 PM. Plaintiff to appear; defendant to appear by phone. (Caggiano, Diana) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Virginia by Kevin Davis. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Wesley Mullen in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration - 10/25/2018 Hr'g Tr.) (Mullen, Wesley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), That the above captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Nancy Givons-Davis. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 1/24/2019. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Henry, Alvena Jennette against Defendant Nancy Givons-Davis (Julian, Kathleen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule and orders the following: (1) Defendants shall serve their motion on the plaintiffs by February 1, 2019; (2) plaintiffs shall serve their opposition on the defendants by March 1, 2019; (3) defendants shall serve their reply, if any, on the plaintiffs by March 15, 2019; and (4) the parties shall upload their motion papers, in chronological order, via ECF by March 15, 2019. The parties are directed to serve two physical courtesy copies on the court on March 15, 2019 as well. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 12/28/2018. (Spriggs, Steven) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 32 Letter Proposing Briefing Schedule (on Consent) for Defendant's Motions to Dismiss and for Rule 11 Sanctions by Kevin Davis, Nancy Givons-Davis (Mullen, Wesley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
November 25, 2018 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kevin Davis, Nancy Givons-Davis, filed by Alvena Jennette, Robert Henry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Julian, Kathleen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED LETTER ORDER granting #29 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Initial Conference adjourned to 2/5/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/1/2018. (Graham, Emily) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 29 Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Kevin Davis, Nancy Givons-Davis, Phenix Bicoastal Salons LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at One Loudon LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Waverly LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Woodbridge LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Cary LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Chesapeke LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Davis Ford Crossing LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Frederiksburg LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Mooresville LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Patterson Place LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Roanoke LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Short Pump LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Southpark LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Springfield LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Virginia Beach LLC, Salon Suites at Federal Hill LLC, Salon Suites at Franklin LLC, Salon Suites at Plantation Point LLC, Salon Suites of Barracks Rd., LLC, Salon Suites of Hampton LLC. (Mullen, Wesley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto: Pre Motion Conference held on 10/25/2018. Appearances: Kathleen Julian, Esq., for plaintiffs; Wesley Mullen, Esq., for all defendants except Platinum Property Management, LLC (which did not appear). Discussions were held regarding defendants' proposed motion to dismiss. The court ORDERED: (1) plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on or before November 26, 2018; (2) on or before December 28, 2018, defendants shall file a letter with the court indicating whether they intend to move to dismiss the amended complaint, and, if so, providing the bases for the motion and a joint proposed briefing schedule; plaintiffs may respond to defendants' letter. (Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Renzler, Katie) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 28 Letter Responding to Defendants' Request for a pre-motion conference by Robert Henry, Alvena Jennette (Julian, Kathleen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #27 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Defendants' request #27 for a pre-motion conference is granted. The parties shall participate in an in-person pre-motion conference with the court on October 25, 2018 at 10 AM in Courtroom 6C South. Counsel for plaintiffs shall file a letter responding to defendants' request for a pre-motion conference, in accordance with Chambers Practices, on or before October 22, 2018. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/19/2018. (Renzler, Katie) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for pre motion conference regarding Defendants' Proposed Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Kevin Davis, Nancy Givons-Davis, Phenix Bicoastal Salons LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at One Loudon LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Waverly LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Woodbridge LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Cary LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Chesapeke LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Davis Ford Crossing LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Frederiksburg LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Mooresville LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Patterson Place LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Roanoke LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Short Pump LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Southpark LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Springfield LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Virginia Beach LLC, Salon Suites at Federal Hill LLC, Salon Suites at Franklin LLC, Salon Suites at Plantation Point LLC, Salon Suites of Barracks Rd., LLC, Salon Suites of Hampton LLC. (Mullen, Wesley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 11/9/2018 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/19/2018. (Caggiano, Diana) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED LETTER ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - 10/12/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/19/2018. (Caggiano, Diana) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 24 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Amended Complaint,, by Kevin Davis, Nancy Givons-Davis, Phenix Bicoastal Salons LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at One Loudon LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Waverly LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Woodbridge LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Cary LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Chesapeke LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Davis Ford Crossing LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Frederiksburg LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Mooresville LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Patterson Place LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Roanoke LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Short Pump LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Southpark LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Springfield LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Virginia Beach LLC, Salon Suites at Federal Hill LLC, Salon Suites at Franklin LLC, Salon Suites at Plantation Point LLC, Salon Suites of Barracks Rd., LLC, Salon Suites of Hampton LLC. (Mullen, Wesley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phenix Bicoastal Salons LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at One Loudon LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Waverly LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Woodbridge LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Cary LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Chesapeke LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Davis Ford Crossing LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Frederiksburg LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Mooresville LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Patterson Place LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Roanoke LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Short Pump LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Southpark LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Springfield LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Virginia Beach LLC, Salon Suites at Federal Hill LLC, Salon Suites at Franklin LLC, Salon Suites at Plantation Point LLC, Salon Suites of Barracks Rd., LLC, Salon Suites of Hampton LLC (Mullen, Wesley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Martin Mullen on behalf of Kevin Davis, Nancy Givons-Davis, Phenix Bicoastal Salons LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at One Loudon LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Waverly LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Woodbridge LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Cary LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Chesapeke LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Davis Ford Crossing LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Frederiksburg LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Mooresville LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Patterson Place LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Roanoke LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Short Pump LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Southpark LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Springfield LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Virginia Beach LLC, Salon Suites at Federal Hill LLC, Salon Suites at Franklin LLC, Salon Suites at Plantation Point LLC, Salon Suites of Barracks Rd., LLC, Salon Suites of Hampton LLC (aty to be noticed) (Mullen, Wesley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joel H. Peck, Clerk of the Commission as to Phenix Salon Suites of Frederiksburg LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel H. Peck, Clerk of the Commission as to Phenix Salon Suites of Short Pump LLC served on 7/31/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (Galeano, Sonia) (Main Document 20 replaced on 8/14/2018) (Galeano, Sonia). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joel H. Peck, Clerk of the Commission as to Phenix Salon Suites of Davis Ford Crossing LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joel H. Peck, Clerk of the Commission as to Phenix Salon Suites of Roanoke LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joel H. Peck, Clerk of the Commission as to Phenix Salon Suites of Virginia Beach LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joel H. Peck, Clerk of the Commission as to Salon Suites of Hampton LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joel H. Peck, Clerk of the Commission as to Salon Suites of Barracks Rd., LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joel H. Peck, Clerk of the Commission as to Phenix Bicoastal Salons LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joel H. Peck, Clerk of the Commission as to Phenix Salon Suites at Woodbridge LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joel H. Peck, Clerk of the Commission as to Phenix Salon Suites of Springfield LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joel H. Peck, Clerk of the Commission as to Phenix Salon Suites of Chesapeke LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Joel H. Peck, Clerk of the Commission, Phenix Salon Suites at One Loudon LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 . Plaintiffs have demonstrated good cause, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), and therefore the request for extension of time to serve and the request for substitute service are granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/18/2018. (Blase, Brendan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Service of Process on Defendants by Robert Henry, Alvena Jennette. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Due Diligence) (Julian, Kathleen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 8 Letter to Court re: April 24, 2018 Order by Robert Henry, Alvena Jennette (Guttenplan, Kenneth) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #2 . Plaintiffs are Ordered to show cause in writing on or before 5/4/2018 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See, e.g., Carter v. HealthPort Techs., LLC, 822 F.3d 47, 60 (2d Cir. 2016) (determining that a complaint was deficient because it contains no allegation as to the identity or citizenship of [the LLC]'s members); Courtyard Apartments Prop. 1 LLC v. Rosenblum, No. 17 CV 2909, 2018 WL 1611386, at *2 (E.D.N.Y. Apr. 3, 2018) (explaining that [a] complaint premised upon diversity of citizenship must allege the citizenship of natural persons who are members of a limited liability company and the place of incorporation and principal place of business of any corporate entities who are members of the limited liability company") (quoting New Millennium Capital Partners III, LLC v. Juniper Grp. Inc., No. 10 CV 46, 2010 WL 1257325, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Mar. 26, 2010)). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/24/2018. (Blase, Brendan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kevin Davis, Nancy Givons-Davis, Phenix Bicoastal Salons LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at One Loudon LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Waverly LLC, Phenix Salon Suites at Woodbridge LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Cary LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Chesapeke LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Davis Ford Crossing LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Frederiksburg LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Mooresville LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Patterson Place LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Roanoke LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Short Pump LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Southpark LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Springfield LLC, Phenix Salon Suites of Virginia Beach LLC, Platinum Property Management LLC, Salon Suites at Federal Hill LLC, Salon Suites at Franklin LLC, Salon Suites at Plantation Point LLC, Salon Suites of Barracks Rd., LLC, Salon Suites of Hampton LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen F. Julian on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Julian, Kathleen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alvena Jennette, Robert Henry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Check, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Check, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Chase Bank Statements, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E - Wells Fargo Statements, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F - Wells Fargo Statemens, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G - Agreement, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H - Wire Transfer, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I - Check) (Guttenplan, Kenneth) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10365592 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Alvena Jennette, Robert Henry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibt B - Check, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Check, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- Bank Statement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Bank Statement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Bank Statement, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Agreement, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Wire Transfer, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Check) (Guttenplan, Kenneth) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennette et al v. Givons-Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites of Frederiksburg LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Givons-Davis
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platinum Property Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites at Woodbridge LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kevin davis
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Represented By: Pierce Christopher Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salon Suites of Barracks Rd., LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites at Waverly LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salon Suites of Hampton LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites of Virginia Beach LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites at One Loudon LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salon Suites at Plantation Point LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites of Davis Ford Crossing LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salon Suites at Federal Hill LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites of Springfield LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites of Patterson Place LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salon Suites at Franklin LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites of Chesapeke LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Bicoastal Salons LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites of Short Pump LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites of Southpark LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites of Mooresville LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites of Cary LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phenix Salon Suites of Roanoke LLC
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Henry
Represented By: Kenneth S. Guttenplan
Represented By: Kathleen F. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: alvena jennette
Represented By: Kenneth S. Guttenplan
Represented By: Kathleen F. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?