Kimble v. KPMG LLP Long Term Disability Plan
Plaintiff: Wendy Kimble
Defendant: KPMG LLP Long Term Disability Plan and The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00929
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Maffeo, Leslie)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by KPMG LLP Long Term Disability Plan.(Maffeo, Leslie)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that KPMG is hereby dismissed without prejudice, and #6 Motion to Substitute Party is GRANTED and Prudential is substituted as Defendant in this matter pursuant to Rule 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Prudential shall have until September 13, 2019, to serve its responsive pleadings to the Complaint. granting Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 8/23/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party And Extention Of Time To File Responsive Pleadings by KPMG LLP Long Term Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maffeo, Leslie)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer KPMG LLP Long Term Disability Plan answer due 8/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 8/14/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by KPMG LLP Long Term Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maffeo, Leslie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KPMG LLP Long Term Disability Plan. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
July 16, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (acha, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Wendy Kimble. (Glass, Benjamin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint For Long-Term Disability Benefits ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6740184.), filed by Wendy Kimble. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Glass, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimble v. KPMG LLP Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPMG LLP Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Leslie Victoria Maffeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Leslie Victoria Maffeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Kimble
Represented By: Benjamin Weaver Glass, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?