Association of Public-Safety Communications Officials International Inc. v. County of Allegheny, PA.
Plaintiff: Association of Public-Safety Communications Officials International Inc.
Defendant: County of Allegheny, Pennsylvania and County of Allegheney, PA.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00932
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for September 20, 2019 #10 is hereby TERMINATED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 9/13/2019. (dzir)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Joint Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by County of Allegheney, PA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haynes, Meredith)
September 10, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (klau, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Hearing Date 09/20/2019 re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Vincent, Paul)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 1/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
September 5, 2019 Notice of Correction re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument (choy, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by County of Allegheney, PA.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haynes, Meredith)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by County of Allegheney, PA.. (Haynes, Meredith)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. County of Allegheney, PA. answer due 9/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 8/12/2019. (rban, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Association of Public-Safety Communications Officials International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vincent, Paul)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to County of Allegheney, PA.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
July 17, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (choy, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Association of Public-Safety Communications Officials International Inc.. (Vincent, Paul)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Association of Public-Safety Communications Officials International Inc.. (Vincent, Paul)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6741398.), filed by Association of Public-Safety Communications Officials International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vincent, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Public-Safety Communications Officials International Inc. v. County of Allegheny, PA.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Public-Safety Communications Officials International Inc.
Represented By: Paul Mayo Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Allegheny, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Allegheney, PA.
Represented By: Meredith Macdonald Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?