Mallon v. International Business Machines Corporation
Plaintiff: James Mallon
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00954
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Business Machines Corporation. (Nieman, Matthew)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. International Business Machines Corporation answer due 11/22/2019. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/16/2019. (lcre, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Joint Motion to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File Responsive Pleading by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nieman, Matthew)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice of Kelli Church. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/13/2019. (lcre, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice of Justin R. Barnes. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/13/2019. (lcre, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelli Church and Certification of Local Counsel Matthew Nieman Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6785132. by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kelli Church Application)(Nieman, Matthew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Justin Barnes and Certification of Local Counsel Matthew Nieman Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6785098. by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Justin Barnes)(Nieman, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Mallon. International Business Machines Corporation waiver sent on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Wise, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to International Business Machines Corporation. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(lcre, )
July 23, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (lcre, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by James Mallon. (Wise, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by James Mallon. (Wise, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6751876.), filed by James Mallon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wise, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallon v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mallon
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Nieman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?