Intravaia et al v. National Rural Electric Cooperative Association et al
Plaintiff: Thaddius Intravaia and Steven Marvik
Defendant: National Rural Electric Cooperative Association and Insurance and Financial Services Committee
Case Number: 1:2019cv00973
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 38 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #33 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C (unredacted), #2 Exhibit D (unsealed), #3 Exhibit E (unsealed))(Junk, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 37 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #33 Memorandum in Support,. (Junk, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 36 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association re #34 MOTION to Seal Redacted Motion to Dismiss Brief and Confidential Exhibits (Junk, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 35 Memorandum in Support re #34 MOTION to Seal Redacted Motion to Dismiss Brief and Confidential Exhibits filed by Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark L. Bieter, #2 Exhibit 1)(Junk, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Seal Redacted Motion to Dismiss Brief and Confidential Exhibits by Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Junk, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 33 Memorandum in Support re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark L. Bieter, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C (sealed), #5 Exhibit D (sealed), #6 Exhibit E (sealed))(Junk, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association. (Junk, Michael)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/3/2019. (dvanm, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 30 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel I. Levin and Certification of Local Counsel Michael L. Junk Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6816581. by Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association. (Junk, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 08/26/2019. (dvanm, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 08/26/2019. (dvanm, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 08/26/2019. (dvanm, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 26 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Shaun A. Gates and Certification of Local Counsel Michael L. Junk Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6803175. by Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association. (Junk, Michael)
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lars C. Golumbic and Certification of Local Counsel Michael L. Junk Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6803163. by Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association. (Junk, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jessica Merry Samuels terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 08/21/2019. (dvanm, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark L. Bieter and Certification of Local Counsel Michael L. Junk [Corrected] by Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association. (Junk, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark L. Bieter and Certification of Local Counsel Michael L. Junk Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6797748. by Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association. (Junk, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants by Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Samuels, Jessica)
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lee Junk on behalf of Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association (Junk, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thaddius Intravaia National Rural Electric Cooperative Association served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019 (Greenberg, Gregg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thaddius Intravaia Insurance and Financial Services Committee served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019 (Greenberg, Gregg)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint shall beFriday, September 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 08/12/2019. (dvanm, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Samuels, Jessica)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association. (Samuels, Jessica)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Merry Samuels on behalf of Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association (Samuels, Jessica)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice of Paul Joseph Lukas. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 7/26/2019. (lcre, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Insurance and Financial Services Committee, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 07/26/2019. (dvanm, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 07/26/2019. (dvanm, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 07/26/2019. (dvanm, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 07/26/2019. (dvanm, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Thaddius Intravaia, Steven Marvik. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Greenberg, Gregg)
July 26, 2019 Notice of Correction re attachments to #1 Complaint. Filing user notified that summons are to be filed separate from the complaint. Documents have been removed as filed in error. (dvanm, )
July 25, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Chloe Alexandria O'Neill and Certification of Local Counsel Gregg Cohen Greenberg Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6758290. by Thaddius Intravaia, Steven Marvik. (Greenberg, Gregg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Joseph Lukas and Certification of Local Counsel Gregg Cohen Greenberg Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6758289. by Thaddius Intravaia, Steven Marvik. (Greenberg, Gregg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Carl Frederick Engstrom and Certification of Local Counsel Gregg Cohen Greenberg Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6758286. by Thaddius Intravaia, Steven Marvik. (Greenberg, Gregg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandon Thomas McDonough and Certification of Local Counsel Gregg Cohen Greenberg Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6758285. by Thaddius Intravaia, Steven Marvik. (Greenberg, Gregg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kai Heinrich Richter and Certification of Local Counsel Gregg Cohen Greenberg Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6758279. by Thaddius Intravaia, Steven Marvik. (Greenberg, Gregg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6758246.), filed by Thaddius Intravaia, Steven Marvik. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons, #3 Supplement Summons)(Greenberg, Gregg) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/26/2019) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/26/2019) (dvanm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intravaia et al v. National Rural Electric Cooperative Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Rural Electric Cooperative Association
Represented By: Jessica Merry Samuels
Represented By: Michael Lee Junk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance and Financial Services Committee
Represented By: Jessica Merry Samuels
Represented By: Michael Lee Junk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddius Intravaia
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Marvik
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?