KELLY v. City Of Alexandria et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY KELLY
Defendant: Robert Dube, Daniel McMaster, Lawrence Schultz and City Of Alexandria
Case Number: 1:2019cv00985
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY KELLY. City Of Alexandria waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Robert Dube waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Daniel McMaster waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Lawrence Schultz waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Miles, Monique)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to City Of Alexandria, Robert Dube, Daniel McMaster, Lawrence Schultz. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
August 6, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Liam O'Grady. District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (rban, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint (Corrected) by ANTHONY KELLY. (Miles, Monique)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (Lawrence Schultz) by ANTHONY KELLY. (Miles, Monique)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (City of Alexandria - City Attorney) by ANTHONY KELLY. (Miles, Monique)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (Daniel McMaster) by ANTHONY KELLY. (Miles, Monique)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (Robert Dube) by ANTHONY KELLY. (Miles, Monique)
July 30, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (choy, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by ANTHONY KELLY. (Miles, Monique)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6764925.), filed by ANTHONY KELLY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miles, Monique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KELLY v. City Of Alexandria et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Alexandria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY KELLY
Represented By: Monique Antonia Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?