Parsons v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Parsons
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. and Walmart Store #3588
Case Number: 1:2019cv00986
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiver their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for 8/21/2019 is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See Order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 8/15/2019. (rban, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Store #3588, Walmart, Inc..(Murdock, John)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/31/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
July 31, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (klau, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc., Walmart Store #3588, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Murdock, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Store #3588, Walmart, Inc..(Murdock, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Prince William County Circuit Court ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6765560.), filed by Walmart, Inc., Walmart Store #3588, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murdock, John) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsons v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Parsons
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: John Mark Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Store #3588
Represented By: John Mark Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?