EDLEY v. BERRYHILL

Plaintiff: Michelle Edley
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv01014
Filed: August 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-01553. Original file and docket sheet received.
August 2, 2019 Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Virginia, pursuant to the Court Order entered 7/18/19. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 18, 2019. (lcrbw1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's #7 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED with respect to the defendant's request to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall forthwith TERMINATE all remaining deadlines in this case and TRANSFER the case file to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 18, 2019. (lcrbw1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MICHELLE EDLEY. (Branch, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 12/7/2018, Reply Defendant's due by 12/14/2018. (hs) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #9 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file her opposition to the defendant's motion to dismiss on or before December 7, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file her reply in support of her motion on or before December 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 30, 2018. (lcrbw1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss by MICHELLE EDLEY (Branch, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 11/30/2018 Reply due by 12/14/2018. (hs) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's #8 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED NUNC PRO TUNC. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file her opposition to the defendant's motion to dismiss on or before November 30, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file her reply in support of her motion on or before December 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 19, 2018. (lcrbw1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss by MICHELLE EDLEY (Branch, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by NANCY A. BERRYHILL, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Martinelli Declaration)(Clark, Denise) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 11/2/2018, (hs) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the #6 Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond. Upon consideration of the Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and the defendant shall file her answer or other response to the plaintiff's complaint on or before November 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 3, 2018. (lcrbw1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
September 29, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by NANCY A. BERRYHILL (Clark, Denise) Modified on 10/1/2018 (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
September 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise M. Clark on behalf of All Defendants (Clark, Denise) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 27, 2018. (lcrbw1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NANCY A. BERRYHILL served on 8/9/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/14/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/10/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/9/2018.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Branch, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
July 2, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5562994) filed by MICHELLE EDLEY. (Attachments: #1 Summons Berryhill, #2 Summons Sessions, #3 Summons Liu, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Branch, David) (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/6/2018) (zsth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EDLEY v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Edley
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?