PATEL v. FDIC et al
Plaintiff: Monal Patel
Defendant: Icf, Inc., Icf Incorporated, LLC. and Fdic
Case Number: 1:2019cv01016
Filed: August 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Claude M Hilton
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 41 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-02707. Original file and docket sheet received.
August 5, 2019 Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Virginia, pursuant to the Court Order entered 7/23/2019. Sent to Court via extraction. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #22 ICF's Motion to Dismiss; denying #26 the Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; granting #26 the Federal Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case, and transferring the case to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia (see document for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/23/19.(ah) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MONAL PATEL re #37 Memorandum in Opposition. "LET THIS BE FILED" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/17/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 38 Memorandum in opposition to re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or in the Alternative to Transfer MOTION to Transfer Case filed by MONAL PATEL. "LET THIS BE FILED" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/17/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to opposition to motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or in the Alternative to Transfer MOTION to Transfer Case filed by FDIC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Borum, Marian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 37 Memorandum in opposition to re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or in the Alternative to Transfer MOTION to Transfer Case filed by MONAL PATEL. (Attachment: #1 ExhibitS) (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 35 Letter from MONAL PATEL. "LET THIS BE FILED" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/23/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/21/2019. (tj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order advising the plaintiff to respond by June 21, 2019, to the Federal Defendant's motion to dismiss or transfer, or risk dismissal of the complaint against this defendant or transfer of the case to the Eastern District of Virginia (see document for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/22/19.(ah) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #33 the Federal Defendant's consent motion to clarify an ECF docket entry number. The Deputy Clerk shall correct ECF No. 30 by linking it to ECF No. 22, thereby accurately recording it as plaintiff's opposition to ICF's Motion to Dismiss. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/21/19.(ah) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Clarify Electronic Court Filing Docket Entry Number by FDIC (Sarisky, Thomas) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to opposition to motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) filed by ICF INCORPORATED, LLC.. (Ticatch, Micah) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 32 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/25/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/24/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FDIC served on 4/23/2019 (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 31 ERRATA by MONAL PATEL #30 Memorandum in Opposition filed by MONAL PATEL. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 30 Memorandum in opposition to re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MONAL PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(ztd) Modified link on on 5/23/2019 (znmw). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 28 Memorandum in opposition to re #25 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Amended Complaint filed by FDIC. (Borum, Marian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 27 Memorandum in opposition to re #25 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Amended Complaint filed by ICF INCORPORATED, LLC.. (Ticatch, Micah) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue or in the Alternative to Transfer by FDIC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Counselor's Report, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Daniell Declaration)(Sarisky, Thomas). Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 5/8/2019 (tth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas James Sarisky on behalf of FDIC (Sarisky, Thomas) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Amended Complaint by MONAL PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit - Attachments, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/3/2019. (tj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #13 Defendant ICF's Motion to Dismiss the initial complaint, in view of its pending motion to dismiss plaintiff's first amended complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/23/19.(ah) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order advising plaintiff to respond by June 3, 2019, to defendant ICF's motion to dismiss the first amended complaint or risk dismissal of the complaint against this defendant based solely on its assertions (see document for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/23/19.(ah) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal), MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by ICF INCORPORATED, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Daniel Declaration, #2 Exhibit Email, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Isler, Edward) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 21 Letter dated 4/10/19 from MONAL PATEL. "LET THIS BE FILED" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/18/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FDIC, ICF INCORPORATED, LLC. with Jury Demand filed by MONAL PATEL. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits) (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing re #10 Summons Returned Executed. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/26/2019 (tj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Marian L. Borum on behalf of FDIC (Borum, Marian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MONAL PATEL. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) "LET THIS BE FILED UNDER SEAL" by Judge Rudolph Contreras. (ztth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order advising plaintiff to respond by April 26, 2019, to Defendant ICF's Motion to Dismiss or risk dismissal of the complaint against this defendant based solely on the assertions in the motion (see document for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/20/19.(ah) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Lee Isler on behalf of ICF, INC. (Isler, Edward) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ICF, INC. (Ticatch, Micah) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal), MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by ICF, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ticatch, Micah) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Micah Ephram Ticatch on behalf of ICF, INC. (Ticatch, Micah) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FDIC served on 3/8/2019. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/8/2019. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/8/2019. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/7/2019.) (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ICF, INC. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (4) Re-issued as to FDIC, ICF, INC., U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zef, ) Modified on 4/3/2019 to correct docket text (jf). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the U.S. Marshals Service to Effect Service of Process: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 4, 2019. (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER denying #5 Motion for Entry of Default: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED, as service has yet to be effected. (SO ORDERED Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 1, 2019). (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from MONAL PATEL dated 2/24/2019. "LET THIS BE FILED" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/1/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default by MONAL PATEL. "LET THIS BE FILED as a Request for Entry of Default which is DENIED. Service has yet to be effected. The Marshals Service is directed to effect service in this case as soon as practical within its available resources." by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/1/2019. (tth) Modified text on 3/6/2019 (tth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued as to FDIC, ICF, INC., U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zef, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/9/2019. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MONAL PATEL (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FDIC, ICF, INC. filed by MONAL PATEL.(zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/20/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATEL v. FDIC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monal Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icf, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Lee Isler
Represented By: Micah Ephram Ticatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icf Incorporated, LLC.
Represented By: Edward Lee Isler
Represented By: Micah Ephram Ticatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fdic
Represented By: Thomas James Sarisky
Represented By: Marian L. Borum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?