Ivanov v. McAleenan, et al.
Plaintiff: Dmitriy Kostadinov Ivanov
Defendant: William P. Barr, Sarah Taylor, Ken Cuccinelli and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv01020
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: John F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certified Mail by Dmitriy Kostadinov Ivanov as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(Drake, David) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (klau, ).
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued for service by Certified Mail as to William P. Barr (U.S. Attorney General), Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Sarah Taylor, U.S. Attorney and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out One electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Dmitriy Kostadinov Ivanov. (Drake, David)
August 6, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, by Dmitriy Kostadinov Ivanov. (Drake, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Kevin McAleenan, Ken Cuccinelli, Sarah Taylor, William P. Barr ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6774948.), filed by Dmitriy Kostadinov Ivanov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibit E)(Drake, David) Modified on 8/6/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivanov v. McAleenan, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dmitriy Kostadinov Ivanov
Represented By: David Christopher Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?