Siles v. VRL Contracting Agency, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maria Siles
Defendant: VRL Contracting Agency, LLC and Vardying Lopez
Case Number: 1:2019cv01026
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 ALIAS Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Vardying Lopez, VRL Contracting Agency, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons Vardying Lopez by Maria Siles. (Lopez-Knapp, Claudia)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons VRL Contracting Agency, LLC by Maria Siles. (Lopez-Knapp, Claudia)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Maria Siles as to VRL Contracting Agency, LLC. (Lopez-Knapp, Claudia)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Maria Siles as to Vardying Lopez. (Lopez-Knapp, Claudia)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Maria Siles as to VRL Contracting Agency, LLC. (Lopez-Knapp, Claudia)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Vardying Lopez, VRL Contracting Agency, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Franklin Powers on behalf of Maria Siles (Powers, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Corrected for VRL Contracting Agency, LLC by Maria Siles. (Lopez-Knapp, Claudia)
August 8, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #2 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been directed to re-file corrected proposed summons for VRL Contracting Agency, LLC (pmil, )
August 7, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (pmil, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Vardying Lopez by Maria Siles. (Lopez-Knapp, Claudia)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons VRL Contracting Agency, LLC by Maria Siles. (Lopez-Knapp, Claudia)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6777772.), filed by Maria Siles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Lopez-Knapp, Claudia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siles v. VRL Contracting Agency, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VRL Contracting Agency, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vardying Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Siles
Represented By: Claudia Mabel Lopez-Knapp
Represented By: Robert Franklin Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?