Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund et al v. Lane Company Mechanical, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund and National Energy Management Institute Commitee
Defendant: Lane Company Mechanical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01028
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: T S Ellis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff:Motion Hearing held on 10/4/2019 re #8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Lane Company Mechanical, Inc. filed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, National Energy Management Institute Commitee, Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry. Appearance of counsel for pltf. Matter is uncontested. Motion taken under advisement. Report and recommendation to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(cmar, )
September 12, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Lane Company Mechanical, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, )
September 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Nachmanoff. #8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Lane Company Mechanical, Inc. (klau, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Hearing Date re #8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Lane Company Mechanical, Inc. (Bardes, Diana)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Lane Company Mechanical, Inc. filed by Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, National Energy Management Institute Commitee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kenneth Anderson Jr., #2 Affidavit of Diana M. Bardes)(Bardes, Diana)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Lane Company Mechanical, Inc. by Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, National Energy Management Institute Commitee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardes, Diana)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lane Company Mechanical, Inc. (jlan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant Lane Company Mechanical, Inc. by Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, National Energy Management Institute Commitee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bardes, Diana)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing that plaintiffs immediately seek the entry of default from the Clerk; directing that promptly after obtaining the entry of default, plaintiffs are directed to file a motion for default judgment and an accompanying memorandum setting forth the factual and legal support for the following findings; directing that the plaintiff file a notice setting the hearing of the motion for default judgment for 10:00 a.m. on Friday, October 4, 2019, before the magistrate judge to whom this action is referred; directing that this matter is referred o the assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 for all further default proceedings and for preparation of a prompt report and recommendation.(See order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 9/4/2019. (aott)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Energy Management Institute Commitee, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry Lane Company Mechanical, Inc. served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019 (Bardes, Diana)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lane Company Mechanical, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
August 8, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (aott, ) Modified on 8/8/2019 (aott, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, National Energy Management Institute Commitee. (Bardes, Diana)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6778929.), filed by National Energy Management Institute Commitee, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bardes, Diana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund et al v. Lane Company Mechanical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust
Represented By: Diana Migliaccio Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry
Represented By: Diana Migliaccio Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Represented By: Diana Migliaccio Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Energy Management Institute Commitee
Represented By: Diana Migliaccio Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Company Mechanical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?