Wilmington Trust, N.A. v. Lujan
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Marleni Melany Lujan
Case Number: 1:2019cv01044
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (klau, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 11, 2019 re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Sneath, Brian)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wilmington Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., #2 Exhibit B., #3 Exhibit C., #4 Exhibit D.)(Sneath, Brian)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Wilmington Trust, N.A.. (Sneath, Brian)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Fairfax County, case number GV19010965-00 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683080122.), filed by Marleni Melany Lujan. (Attachments: #1 Amended Grounds of Defense and Counterclaim, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(lcre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Trust, N.A. v. Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marleni Melany Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Brian Robert Sneath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?