In re: Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc. Data Breach Litigation
Plaintiff: Daniel Cho, Sayed Abubaker, Magdalyne Hilliard, Joseph Cardiff and Daniel W. Cho
Defendant: Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company, Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Avalon Insurance Company and Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Mark Bradley, Matthew Slate, Amber S. Parker, Kimberly Henshaw and Matthew A. Slate
Consolidated Defendant: Providence Health Plan
Case Number: 1:2019cv01050
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick John Curran, Jr on behalf of Providence Health Plan (Curran, Patrick)
July 9, 2020 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified that document [document number] is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document re #142 Notice of Appearance (lcre, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick John Curran, Jr on behalf of Providence Health Plan (Curran, Patrick)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Providence Health Plan is granted and Mr. Reing representation of Providence Health Plan inthis case is terminated. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/07/2020. (jlan)
July 7, 2020 Filing 140 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Providence Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reing, Daniel)
February 19, 2020 Filing 139 USCA Case Number 20-1180 4th Circuit; Case Manager Jeffrey S. Neal for #137 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Cho, Joseph Cardiff. (aott)
February 19, 2020 Filing 138 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #137 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (klau, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #136 Order on Motion to Stay,,, #131 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0422-7078610. (DiMuro, Bernard)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER re #134 Motion to Stay ORDERS as follows: 1. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 54(b), final judgment under Rule 12(b)( 1) is entered as to Plaintiffs Joseph Cardiff and Daniel Cho in Abubaker et al. v. Dominion Dental USA, Inc. et at.. Case No. 1:19-cv-01050-LMB-MSN, because there is no just reason for delay. 2. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 1 and this Court's inherent authority to efficiently manage this litigation, all proceedings in Abubaker et al. v. Dominion Dental USA, Inc. et al.., Case No. l:19-cv-01050-LMB-MSN are stayed pending resolution of the related, consolidated appeals in Slate et al. v. Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Appeal No. 20-1102 and Bradley v. Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Appeal No. 20-1103 and any appeals filed by Plaintiffs Cardiff and Cho. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/18/20. (klau, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 135 Waiver of re #134 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings and For Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) Oral Argument [Conditional] by Sayed Abubaker, Magdalyne Hilliard (DiMuro, Bernard)
February 7, 2020 Filing 134 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings and For Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) by Sayed Abubaker, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DiMuro, Bernard)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #129 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/21/20. (klau, )
January 18, 2020 Filing 132 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/17/2020, before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER: This litigation arose out of three civil actions that were filed in this district under numbers 1: 19-cv-l 050, 1: 19-cv-1063, and 1: 19-cv-1199, and subsequently consolidated under number I: 19-cv-l 050. For the reasons stated in open court, these three civil actions are unconsolidated;defendant Providence Health Plan's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Consolidated Class Action Complaint [Dkt. No. 105] is GRANTED; and defendants Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Inc., Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., and Dominion National Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss FirstConsolidated Class Action Complaint [Dkt. No. 108) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; and it is hereby ORDERED that civil actions 1: 19-cv-1063 and l: l 9-cv-1199 be and are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because the Court lacks jurisdiction due to the named plaintiffs not having Article III standing; and it is further ORDERED that civil action 1: 19-cv-l 050 be and is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to all plaintiffs except Magdalyne Hilliard and Sayed Abubaker, who are the only two named plaintiffs who have alleged sufficient facts to show Article III standing; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs file an amended, streamlined complaint in civil action 1: 19-cv-1050 as directed in open court. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/17/20. (yguy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 130 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 1/17/2020. Appearances of counsel. Motions argued. Defts #105 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for lack of standing is GRANTED. Defts #108 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of standing and failure to state a claim is GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART. (order to follow) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 129 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Nathan and Certification of Local Counsel Bernard J. DiMuro Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7030531. by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate. (DiMuro, Bernard)
January 16, 2020 Filing 128 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/10/2020, before Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff, Transcriber Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
January 10, 2020 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #108 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of standing and failure to state a claim filed by Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Abubaker Letter)(McKnight, Katherine)
January 10, 2020 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #105 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for lack of standing filed by Providence Health Plan. (Reing, Daniel)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Provide Interrogatory Answers (Dkt. No. #117 ). Having reviewed the Motion, and for the reasons stated from the bench, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED in part. Defendants shall supplement their Interrogatory responses by 12:00 p.m. on January 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 01/10/20. (cmar, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 124 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff:Motion Hearing held on 1/10/2020 re #117 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Provide Interrogatory Answers filed by Magdalyne Hilliard, Mark Bradley, Daniel W. Cho, Sayed Abubaker, Matthew A. Slate, Joseph Cardiff. Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and GRANTED in part. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(cmar, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 123 Reply to #117 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Provide Interrogatory Answers in Support of filed by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(DiMuro, Bernard)
January 8, 2020 Filing 122 Opposition to #117 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Provide Interrogatory Answers filed by Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney K. McKnight)(Mcknight, Katherine)
January 6, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Nachmanoff. #117 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Provide Interrogatory Answers (clar, )
January 6, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #117 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Provide Interrogatory Answers. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (clar, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 121 Opposition to #105 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for lack of standing filed by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate. (DiMuro, Bernard)
January 3, 2020 Filing 120 Opposition to #108 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of standing and failure to state a claim filed by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate. (DiMuro, Bernard)
January 3, 2020 Filing 119 Notice of Hearing Date set for January 10, 2020 re #117 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Provide Interrogatory Answers (DiMuro, Bernard)
January 3, 2020 Filing 118 Memorandum in Support re #117 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Provide Interrogatory Answers filed by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(DiMuro, Bernard)
January 3, 2020 Filing 117 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Provide Interrogatory Answers by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DiMuro, Bernard)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #97 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 12/27/2019. (rban, )
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #99 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 12/27/2019. (dvanm, )
December 21, 2019 Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 12/13/2019, before Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff, Transcriber Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/21/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #93 Motion to Compel (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 12/19/19. (cmar, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 112 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #97 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to ECF Dkt. No. 96, #96 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #111 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C),. (Mcknight, Katherine)
December 16, 2019 Filing 111 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company re #97 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to ECF Dkt. No. 96 (Mcknight, Katherine)
December 16, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #108 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of standing and failure to state a claim, #105 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for lack of standing. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 110 Notice of Hearing Date set for 1/17/2020 re #108 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of standing and failure to state a claim (Mcknight, Katherine)
December 13, 2019 Filing 109 Memorandum in Support re #108 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of standing and failure to state a claim filed by Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David A. Carney, #2 Exhibit A to Carney Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Carney Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Carney Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Carney Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Carney Decl., #7 Exhibit F to Carney Decl., #8 Exhibit G to Carney Decl., #9 Affidavit Declaration of Kara Greenhouse)(Mcknight, Katherine)
December 13, 2019 Filing 108 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of standing and failure to state a claim by Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mcknight, Katherine)
December 13, 2019 Filing 107 Notice of Hearing Date re #106 Memorandum in Support, #105 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for lack of standing (Reing, Daniel)
December 13, 2019 Filing 106 Memorandum in Support re #105 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for lack of standing filed by Providence Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Reing Declaration, #2 Exh. 1 to Reing Decl., #3 Exh. 2 to Reing Decl.)(Reing, Daniel)
December 13, 2019 Filing 105 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for lack of standing by Providence Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reing, Daniel)
December 13, 2019 Notice of Correction re #97 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to ECF Dkt. No. 96, An incomplete document was filed. The filing user has been notified to file Notice of Rule 5 and file the seal document as well. (klau, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 104 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff:Motion Hearing held on 12/13/2019 re #93 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Produce Mandiant Report and Related Documents filed by Magdalyne Hilliard, Mark Bradley, Daniel W. Cho, Sayed Abubaker, Matthew A. Slate, Joseph Cardiff. Appearances of counsel for plaintiffs and defendants. Mandiant report to be submitted to Chambers for an in camera review. Motion argued and #93 MOTION to Compel - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(wgar, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Jayna Genti on behalf of Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate (Genti, Jayna)
December 12, 2019 Filing 102 Memorandum in Support re #99 MOTION to Seal filed by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate. (DiMuro, Bernard)
December 12, 2019 Filing 101 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #99 MOTION to Seal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(DiMuro, Bernard)
December 12, 2019 Filing 100 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate re #99 MOTION to Seal (DiMuro, Bernard)
December 12, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION to Seal by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DiMuro, Bernard)
December 12, 2019 Filing 98 Reply to #93 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Produce Mandiant Report and Related Documents filed by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(DiMuro, Bernard)
December 12, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to ECF Dkt. No. 96 by Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mcknight, Katherine)
December 11, 2019 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re #93 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Produce Mandiant Report and Related Documents filed by Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kip Miller, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Work)(Mcknight, Katherine)
December 9, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #93 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Produce Mandiant Report and Related Documents. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, )
December 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Nachmanoff. #93 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Produce Mandiant Report and Related Documents (klau, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Providence Health Plan, Matthew A. Slate re #93 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Produce Mandiant Report and Related Documents /Local Civil Rule 37 Certification (DiMuro, Bernard)
December 6, 2019 Filing 94 Notice of Hearing Date set for December 13, 2019 re #93 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Produce Mandiant Report and Related Documents (DiMuro, Bernard)
December 6, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION to Compel Dominion National Defendants to Produce Mandiant Report and Related Documents by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(DiMuro, Bernard)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #90 Motion. ORDERED that the erroneous First Consolidated Class Action Complaint #88 be removed from the public docket and maintained under seal; and it is further ORDERED that the corrected First Consolidated Class Action Complaint #89 will serve as the only operative complaint in this civil action. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/25/2019. (dvanm, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 91 Waiver of re #90 MOTION to Remove Dkt. 88 From the Court's Docket Uncontested Oral Argument by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate (DiMuro, Bernard)
November 25, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION to Remove Dkt. 88 From the Court's Docket Uncontested by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel W. Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard, Matthew A. Slate. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DiMuro, Bernard)
November 22, 2019 Filing 89 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand CORRECTED First Consolidated Class Action against Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company, Providence Health Plan, filed by Joseph Cardiff, Sayed Abubaker, Daniel W. Cho, Matthew A. Slate, Mark Bradley, Magdalyne Hilliard.(DiMuro, Bernard) Modified text on 11/25/2019 (klau, ).
November 22, 2019 Filing 88 (Sealed pursuant to Order #92 ) AMENDED COMPLAINT First Consolidated Class Action.(DiMuro, Bernard) Modified on 11/25/2019 (dvanm, ). Modified on 11/25/2019 (aott, ).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on parties' proposed Stipulated Order Governing Discovery of Documents and Electronically Stored Information (Dkt. No. #81 ), proposed Stipulated Order Under Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) and (e) Governing Clawback Terms and Procedures (Dkt. No. #82 ), and proposed Stipulated Protective Order (Dkt. No. #83 ). After a review of the proposals, it is herebyORDERED that all three proposed orders are approved and shall be entered without modification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 11/20/19. (cmar, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 86 Waiver of re #83 Joint MOTION to Enter Stipulated Protective Order Oral Argument by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate (DiMuro, Bernard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 85 Waiver of re #82 Joint MOTION to Enter Stipulated Order Under Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) and (e) Governing Clawback Terms and Procedures Oral Argument by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate (DiMuro, Bernard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 84 Waiver of re #81 Joint MOTION to Enter Stipulated Order Governing Discovery of Documents and Electronically Stored Information Oral Argument by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate (DiMuro, Bernard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 83 Joint MOTION to Enter Stipulated Protective Order by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(DiMuro, Bernard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 82 Joint MOTION to Enter Stipulated Order Under Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) and (e) Governing Clawback Terms and Procedures by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DiMuro, Bernard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 81 Joint MOTION to Enter Stipulated Order Governing Discovery of Documents and Electronically Stored Information by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DiMuro, Bernard)
November 13, 2019 Filing 80 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Capital BlueCross, Dominion National Insurance Company, Avalon Insurance Company, Dominion Dental USA, Inc.. (Mcknight, Katherine)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that: 1. The Amended Second Joint Proposed Discovery Plan (Dkt. No. 78) filed by the parties is approved unless modified by the court herein or hereafter. 2. Rule 26(a) disclosures, depositions, interrogatories, requests for documents and admissions, and answers thereto shall not be filed except on order of the court, or for use in a motion or at trial. 3. No "general objection" may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. 4. To the extent any party intends to assert a claim of privilege or protection as to trial preparation material, any such claim must be made in a timely manner and in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(b)(5). 5. The Final Pre-Trial Conference will be held on June 18, 2020. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 11/12/19. (cmar, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 78 AMENDED Second Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate.(DiMuro, Bernard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 77 Second Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate.(DiMuro, Bernard)
November 6, 2019 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/6/2019. Appearances of counsel. ESI and privilege by 11/15/19. Amended complaint by 11/22/19. Rule 26 initial disclosures by 12/2/19. Expert disclosure proposal adopted. Parties to confer on class certification deadlines. Discovery deadline stays 5/15/20. Final Pretrial conference continued to 6/18/20. 2nd proposed discovery plan to be submitted by COB Friday. Order to issue. (Tape #FTR.)(cmar, )
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Appointment of Co-Lead and Interim Class Counsel, Liaison Counsel, and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. ORDERED that Kim D. Stephens and Barrett J. Vahle are appointed plaintiffs' Co-Lead and Interim Class Counsel; Bernard J. DiMuro is appointed plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel; and Swathi Bojedla, Thiago M. Coelho, Andrew N. Friedman, Mark S. Goldman, and Matthew D. Schultz shall comprise the plaintiffs' Steering Committee. ORDERED that both orders [Dkt. Nos. 38 and 58] be and are VACATED, except to the extent the October 3 Order consolidated Civil Action Nos. l:19-cv-1063 and l:19-cv-1199, which shall remain in effect, and except for the portion of the October 16 Order that scheduled a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) pretrial conference for November 6, 2019 at 11:00 am, which will go forward ---- (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/1/19. (klau, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 74 Joint Discovery Plan by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate.(DiMuro, Bernard)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #68 Motion to Vacate. ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for November 1,2019 be and is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/31/19. (klau, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Abraham McBeth on behalf of Kimberly Henshaw, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate (McBeth, Isaac)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/29/2019. (dvanm, )
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/29/2019. (dvanm, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 69 Waiver of re #68 Joint MOTION to Vacate #57 Notice of Hearing Date Oral Argument by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate (DiMuro, Bernard)
October 29, 2019 Filing 68 Joint MOTION to Vacate #57 Notice of Hearing Date by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate. (DiMuro, Bernard)
October 28, 2019 Filing 67 Waiver Returned Executed of Service of Summons as to Providence Health Plan for case no. 1:19cv1199 , Waiver sent on 9/19/19, answer due 11/18/19, by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate (DiMuro, Bernard) Modified text on 10/29/2019 to add answer due date (klau, ).
October 28, 2019 Filing 66 Waiver of Service of Summons as to Dominion Dental Services, Inc. for case no. 1:19cv1199 served on 9/19/19, by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate (DiMuro, Bernard) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (klau, ).
October 28, 2019 Filing 65 Waiver of Service of Summons as to Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc. for case no. 1:19cv1199, served on 9/19/19 by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate (DiMuro, Bernard) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (klau, ).
October 28, 2019 Filing 64 Waiver of Service of Summons as to Capital BlueCross for case no. 1:19cv1199, served on 9/19/19 by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate (DiMuro, Bernard) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (klau, ).
October 28, 2019 Filing 63 Waiver of Service of Summons as to Capital Advantage Insurance Company for case no. 1:19cv1199 served on 9/19/19 by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate (DiMuro, Bernard) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (klau, ).
October 25, 2019 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Providence Health Plan. (Reing, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 61 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Bradley L. Fisher and Certification of Local Counsel Daniel P. Reing Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6906198. by Providence Health Plan. (Reing, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 60 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Rachel H. Herd and Certification of Local Counsel Daniel P. Reing Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6906175. by Providence Health Plan. (Reing, Daniel) Modified text on 10/25/2019 to correct applicant last name(klau, ).
October 25, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Peter Reing on behalf of Providence Health Plan (Reing, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #54 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel /Appointment of Co-Lead and Interim Class Counsel, Liaison Counsel, and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(rban, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 57 Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/1/19 re #54 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel /Appointment of Co-Lead and Interim Class Counsel, Liaison Counsel, and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (DiMuro, Bernard)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/15/19. (klau, )
October 15, 2019 Notice of Correction re #54 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel /Appointment of Co-Lead and Interim Class Counsel, Liaison Counsel, and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (klau, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 55 Memorandum in Support re #54 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel /Appointment of Co-Lead and Interim Class Counsel, Liaison Counsel, and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Providence Health Plan, Matthew Slate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Errata Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(DiMuro, Bernard)
October 14, 2019 Filing 54 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel /Appointment of Co-Lead and Interim Class Counsel, Liaison Counsel, and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DiMuro, Bernard)
October 14, 2019 Filing 53 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Swathi Bojedla and Certification of Local Counsel Bernard J. DiMuro Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6885407. by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate. (DiMuro, Bernard)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/11/19. (klau, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/11/19. (klau, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/11/19. (klau, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 49 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Michael Stephan and Certification of Local Counsel Bernard J. DiMuro Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6881901. by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate. (DiMuro, Bernard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 48 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Karina Puttieva and Certification of Local Counsel Bernard J. DiMuro Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6881883. by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate. (DiMuro, Bernard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 47 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Neil Friedman and Certification of Local Counsel Bernard J. DiMuro Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6881857. by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate. (DiMuro, Bernard)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/9/19. (klau, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/9/19. (klau, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/9/19. (klau, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/9/19. (klau, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 42 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberle Don Stephens and Certification of Local Counsel Bernard J. DiMuro Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6877402. by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate. (DiMuro, Bernard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 41 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca Luise Solomon and Certification of Local Counsel Bernard J. DiMuro Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6877381. by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate. (DiMuro, Bernard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 40 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Joseph Pizzirusso and Certification of Local Counsel Bernard J. DiMuro Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6877376. by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate. (DiMuro, Bernard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 39 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason Todd Dennett and Certification of Local Counsel Bernard J. DiMuro Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6877351. by Sayed Abubaker, Mark Bradley, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Kimberly Henshaw, Magdalyne Hilliard, Amber S. Parker, Matthew Slate. (DiMuro, Bernard)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that Civil Action Nos. 19-01063 and 19-cv-01199 shall be consolidated with Civil Action No. 19-01050, with Civil Action No. 19- 01050 LMB-MSN under the caption of In re Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc. Data Breach Litigation. It is further hereby ORDERED that: 1) Responses to the current complaints in these actions are stayed --- 4) A response to the Consolidated Amended Complaint from defendants shall be filed within thirty days after the filing of the Consolidated Amended Complaint (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/3/19. (klau, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 37 STIPULATION to Consolidate Actions and for Entry of Case Management Order by Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mcknight, Katherine)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/13/19. (klau, )
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/13/19. (klau, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 34 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Schultz and Certification of Local Counsel Steven T. Webster Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6833367. by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
September 12, 2019 Filing 33 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason A. Ibey and Certification of Local Counsel Steven T. Webster Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6833359. by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/11/19. (klau, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/11/19. (klau, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 30 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Gregory Karlsgodt and Certification of Local Counsel Katherine McKnight Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6828774. by Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company. (Mcknight, Katherine)
September 10, 2019 Filing 29 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Carney and Certification of Local Counsel Katherine McKnight Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6828751. by Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company. (Mcknight, Katherine)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDERED that 1:19-cv-1063 be reassigned as directed by this Order (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 09/09/2019. (jlan)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/9/2019. (rban, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extension of Time to Respond)(Mcknight, Katherine)
September 4, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company re #1 Complaint of Related Cases (Mcknight, Katherine)
September 4, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lea Mcknight on behalf of Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company (Mcknight, Katherine)
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc. served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019 (aott, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dominion Dental USA, Inc. served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019 (aott)
August 26, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; Dominion Dental Services, Inc. served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; Dominion National Insurance Company served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (dvanm, )
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/19/19. (klau, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael K. Yarnoff and Certification of Local Counsel Steven T. Webster Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6791682. by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/14/19. (klau, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/14/19. (klau, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/14/19. (klau, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/14/19. (klau, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jillian R. Dent and Certification of Local Counsel Steven T. Webster Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6787318. by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Barrett J. Vahle and Certification of Local Counsel Steven T. Webster Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6787316. by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Norman E. Siegel and Certification of Local Counsel Steven T. Webster Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6787313. by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark S. Goldman and Certification of Local Counsel Steven T. Webster Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6787305. by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Avalon Insurance Company, Capital Advantage Insurance Company, Capital BlueCross, Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc., Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Dominion Dental Services, Inc., Dominion Dental USA, Inc., Dominion National Insurance Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
August 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (jlan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons to Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey, Inc. by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons to Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc. by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons to Dominion Dental Services, Inc. by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons to Dominion Dental USA, Inc. by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to Dominion National Insurance Company by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Avalon Insurance Company by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Capital Advantage Insurance Company by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Capital BlueCross by Sayed Abubaker, Joseph Cardiff, Daniel Cho, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Webster, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6782879.), filed by Daniel Cho, Joseph Cardiff, Sayed Abubaker, Magdalyne Hilliard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webster, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc. Data Breach Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Cho
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sayed Abubaker
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Represented By: Jayna Genti
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalyne Hilliard
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Represented By: Jayna Genti
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cardiff
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Represented By: Jayna Genti
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel W. Cho
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Represented By: Jayna Genti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Dental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Lea Mcknight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion National Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine Lea Mcknight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Dental USA, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Lea Mcknight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Advantage Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine Lea Mcknight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital BlueCross
Represented By: Katherine Lea Mcknight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Dental Services of New Jersey
Represented By: Katherine Lea Mcknight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine Lea Mcknight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Dental Services USA, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Lea Mcknight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mark Bradley
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Represented By: Jayna Genti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Matthew Slate
Represented By: Isaac Abraham McBeth
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Amber S. Parker
Represented By: Jonathan Eric Halperin
Represented By: Isaac Abraham McBeth
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kimberly Henshaw
Represented By: Jonathan Eric Halperin
Represented By: Isaac Abraham McBeth
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Matthew A. Slate
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Represented By: Jayna Genti
Represented By: Isaac Abraham McBeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Providence Health Plan
Represented By: Daniel Peter Reing
Represented By: Patrick John Curran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?