Parr v. AmeriHome Mortgage Company, LLC
Appellant: Mary Catherine Parr
Appellee: AmeriHome Mortgage Company, LLC
Interested Party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Case Number: 1:2019cv01056
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that this appeal be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/25/19. (c/m on 9/25/19)(klau, )
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that within five (5) days of this Order, Appellant shall pay the required filing fees. If, within (5) days of this Order, Appellant has not paid the required filing fees, then this action shall be dismissed for failure to follow bankruptcy procedure rules. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 9/9/2019. (dzir)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet received from USBC with No Designation of Record. (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal)(klau, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-11487, filed by Mary Catherine Parr. (Fee Not Paid) (Attachments: #1 Copy of transmittal sheet)(klau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parr v. AmeriHome Mortgage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mary Catherine Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: AmeriHome Mortgage Company, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Virginia French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?