Lee v. Imagine Milling Technologies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hye Kyung Lee
Defendant: Degree of Freedom USA, Inc., Imagine Milling Technologies, LLC, Herodent, Inc., Susan Jung and Felix Seori Chung
Case Number: 1:2019cv01059
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion #7 is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants Imagine Milling Technologies, LLC, Herodent, Inc., Felix Seori Chung, and Susan Jung shall have until November 18, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 10/1/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Felix Seori Chung, Herodent, Inc., Imagine Milling Technologies, LLC, Susan Jung. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wahl, Barbara)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hye Kyung Lee. Susan Jung waiver sent on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Scher, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hye Kyung Lee. Imagine Milling Technologies, LLC waiver sent on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Scher, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hye Kyung Lee. Herodent, Inc. waiver sent on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Scher, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hye Kyung Lee. Felix Seori Chung waiver sent on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Scher, David)
August 13, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (acha, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Hye Kyung Lee. (Scher, David)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, FRAUD, UNJUST ENRICHMENT, WHISTLEBLOWER RETALIATION, DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6786909.), filed by Hye Kyung Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Scher, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Imagine Milling Technologies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Degree of Freedom USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imagine Milling Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Barbara Susan Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herodent, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Susan Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Jung
Represented By: Barbara Susan Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Seori Chung
Represented By: Barbara Susan Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hye Kyung Lee
Represented By: David Lawrence Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?