Busby et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Tashayia Busby and Damien Ross
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc., Capital One, N.A., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01062
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard Joseph DiMuro on behalf of Tashayia Busby, Damien Ross (DiMuro, Bernard)
August 17, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One, N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Zinsner, Mary)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 8/16/2019. (rban, )
August 16, 2019 Notice of Correction re #10 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint . The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (choy, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Order Staying Proceedings)(Zinsner, Mary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Corrected Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons to Amazon.com, Inc. (Corrected) by Tashayia Busby, Damien Ross. (Toll, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (choy, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons to Amazon Web Services, Inc. by Tashayia Busby, Damien Ross. (Toll, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to Amazon.com, Inc. by Tashayia Busby, Damien Ross. (Toll, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. by Tashayia Busby, Damien Ross. (Toll, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Capital One, N.A. by Tashayia Busby, Damien Ross. (Toll, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Capital One Financial Corporation by Tashayia Busby, Damien Ross. (Toll, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6787366.), filed by Tashayia Busby, Damien Ross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Toll, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Busby et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tashayia Busby
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Toll
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damien Ross
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Toll
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?