Queen v. Rice et al
Plaintiff: Valencia Queen
Defendant: Eagle Express Lines, Inc. and Rudolph Rice
Case Number: 1:2019cv01091
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 It is hereby ORDERED that the joint motion to remand #2 is GRANTED and this matter is REMANDED to the Fairfax County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 09/04/2019. (dvanm, c/m 9/4/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Valencia Queen. (Bilton, Daniel)
August 16, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6793852.), filed by Rudolph Rice, Eagle Express Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notification of case, #2 Exhibit Complaint in state court, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoffman, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Queen v. Rice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valencia Queen
Represented By: Daniel Cory Bilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Express Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudolph Rice
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?