District Equities Real Estate, LLC v. Urbanspace Tysons, LLC
Plaintiff: District Equities Real Estate, LLC
Defendant: Urbanspace Tysons, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01096
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/15/2019. (dvanm, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Without Prejudice Subject to Transfer of Claims to Arbitration by District Equities Real Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schwaber, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
October 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/01/2019 re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Schwaber, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Hearing Date set for 10/25/2019 re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Schwaber, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Date re #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss (Shaw, Adam)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss filed by Urbanspace Tysons, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consulting Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Demand for Arbitration)(Shaw, Adam)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss by Urbanspace Tysons, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaw, Adam)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by District Equities Real Estate, LLC. (Schwaber, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Notice of Correction re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument.(klau, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by District Equities Real Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A (Affidavit of S. Gaudio), #3 Exhibit B (Affidavit of Pradachith, #4 Exhibit C (Affidavit of Lai), #5 Exhibit D (Affidavit of Brown), #6 Exhibit E (Affidavit of Jang), #7 Exhibit F (A Taste of Urbanspace flyer))(Schwaber, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/19/2019. (rban, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alec Farr and Certification of Local Counsel Adam Shaw Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6843405. by Urbanspace Tysons, LLC. (Shaw, Adam)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that the time in which Defendant may file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended fourteen (14) days, up to and including October 2, 2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 9/16/2019. (dzir)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Urbanspace Tysons, LLC. (Shaw, Adam)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Urbanspace Tysons, LLC. (Shaw, Adam)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service returned executed for Summons & Complaint as to Urbanspace Tysons, LLC served on 08/28/2019, answer due 9/18/19, filed by District Equities Real Estate, LLC. (Schwaber, Jeffrey) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (klau, ).
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Deanna Layne Peters on behalf of District Equities Real Estate, LLC (Peters, Deanna)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Urbanspace Tysons, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
August 20, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by District Equities Real Estate, LLC. (Schwaber, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against Urbanspace Tysons, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6796441.), filed by District Equities Real Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwaber, Jeffrey) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: District Equities Real Estate, LLC v. Urbanspace Tysons, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urbanspace Tysons, LLC
Represented By: Adam Lee Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Equities Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Schwaber
Represented By: Deanna Layne Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?