NATHAN v. TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.
Plaintiff: Noah Nathan
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01101
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
2 Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 9/23/2019. (rban, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by S. Jeanine Conley Daves and Certification of Local Counsel G. Bethany Ingle Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6848278. by Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. (Ingle, Gilda)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #19 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 18, 2019, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's August 27, 2019 Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 09/13/2019. (lgue, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc..(Ingle, Gilda)
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilda Bethany Ingle on behalf of Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. (Ingle, Gilda)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis.Discovery due by 1/10/2020.Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (if the parties do not file dispositive motions).Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (if the parties do file dispositive motions). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 08/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(tran)
August 27, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III. District Judge Claude M. Hilton no longer assigned to the case. (aott, )
August 23, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Claude M. Hilton. District Judge Anthony J Trenga no longer assigned to the case. (rban, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-04547. Original file and docket sheet received.
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, U.S.A., INC. MOTION TO TRANSFER IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA AND THIS MATTER IS MARKED CLOSED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/17/19. 7/17/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, U.S.A., INC. MOTION TO TRANSFER IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/17/19. 7/17/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY Brief in Support re #6 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.. (LABORDA NELSON, ALEXA) Modified on 3/26/2019 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by SYLVIA JEANINE CONLEY on behalf of TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. with Certificate of Service(CONLEY, SYLVIA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANT TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. MAY FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER SHALL BE EXTENDED TO 3/25/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/19/19. 3/20/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 STIPUALTION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANT TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. MAY FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS EXTENDED TO 3/15/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/1/19. 3/1/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by NOAH NATHAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(MACEY, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH PLAINTIFF NOAH NATHAN MAY RESPOND TO DEFENDANT TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A.., INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL 2/25/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/12/19. 2/12/19 ENTERED AND AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. MACEY, JR on behalf of NOAH NATHAN with Certificate of Service(MACEY, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LABORDA NELSON, ALEXA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC..(LABORDA NELSON, ALEXA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC..(LABORDA NELSON, ALEXA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. TIME TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 1/28/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/21/18. 12/21/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NOAH NATHAN. TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (BELL, JAMES) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
October 22, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NOAH NATHAN. (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Summons Issued as to TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/23/18 (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 186724.), filed by NOAH NATHAN.(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATHAN v. TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Nathan
Represented By: Christopher A. Macey, Jr.
Represented By: James A. Bell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Alexa Joy Laborda Nelson
Represented By: Sylvia Jeanine Conley
Represented By: Gilda Bethany Ingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?