Dutia v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Appellant: Suresh Dutia
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Interested Party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankrupty Court)
Case Number: 1:2019cv01113
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: John F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Set Hearings: Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 1/17/2020at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr.. (dvanm, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 11/25/2019. Appellee's brief is due by 30 days from the date of service of appellants brief.Appellant may file a reply brief within 14 days from the date of service of appellees brief.(dvanm, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Restricted Records re: Designation of Record. (dvanm, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet together with Designation of Record. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Record - Part 1, #2 Designation of Record - Part 2)(dvanm, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Tarkenton on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Tarkenton, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-11143-KHK. File received, filed by Suresh Dutia. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dutia v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Suresh Dutia
Represented By: John P. Forest, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Malcolm Brooks Savage, III
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Tarkenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankrupty Court)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?