Juul Labs, Inc. v. The Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Defendant: The Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A, Abdulrasool Ghulamhussain, Mohammed Jaber, Daniel Mendoza, Yin Ping Li, Evan Wilkins, Mark Anthony Batersal, Zhu Qiongqi, Sibel Toy, Eric Legus, Shella May Limas, Haylyuk Dall, Phillip Evans, Joesine Himang Loloy, Walter Furman, Xiao Huan, John Jeffrey, Jerry Millsap, Xiaohua Fang, William Miller, Nicholas Broome, Francis Noone, Pasa Living, Jimmy Carl Teal, Lei Yang, Marie DeFonte, Ben Inguanzo, Farva Jafri, Kristina Placentia, Conrad Schulman, Jim Smith, Ray Nasser, Vincenzo Velasco, Ricky Pinedo, Andrea Sperry, Shu Qing, Yuehua Huang and Jallal Ali
Case Number: 1:2019cv01126
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 50 Summons Issued for Amended Complaint for service by EMail (per order dated 10/11/19) as to Xiao Huan, Yuehua Huang, Shella May Limas, Yin Ping Li, Shu Qing, Zhu Qiongqi, Lei Yang. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint and Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 49 Summons Issued for Amended Complaint for service by SPS as to Jallal Ali, Nicholas Broome, Haylyuk Dall, Marie DeFonte, Phillip Evans, Xiaohua Fang, Walter Furman, Abdulrasool Ghulamhussain, Ben Inguanzo, Mohammed Jaber, Farva Jafri, John Jeffrey, Eric Legus, Daniel Mendoza, William Miller, Jerry Millsap, Ray Nasser, Francis Noone, Ricky Pinedo, Kristina Placentia, Conrad Schulman, Jim Smith, Andrea Sperry, Jimmy Carl Teal, Sibel Toy, Vincenzo Velasco, Evan Wilkins. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint and Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, ) Modified text on 10/17/2019 (klau, ).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/11/2019. (awac, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/11/2019. (awac, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Liam O'Grady:Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2019 re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Juul Labs, Inc., #37 MOTION for Service by Publication by Email filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff enters their appearance; no appearance made for defendants. No responses have been filed to the pleadings. Court grants the motions and also grants #41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Janie Arriaga - Contractor.)(awac, )
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re #41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Juul Labs, Inc. Accordingly, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) the Court DISMISSES this case only as to: No. 8 Defendant Pasa Living, No. 23 Defendant Joesine Himang Loloy, No. 24 defendant Mark Anthony Batersal. Defendants number 8, 23 and 24, identified above, WITHOUT PREJUDICE (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/10/19. (klau, )
October 10, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of Service re #33 Amended Complaint,, #35 Memorandum in Support, #38 Memorandum in Support, #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #37 MOTION for Service by Publication by Email, #41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #36 Notice of Hearing Date, #43 Proposed Summons, #40 Waiver of, #39 Declaration, #42 Proposed Summons by Monica Riva Talley on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Talley, Monica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 43 Proposed Summons as to Certain Defendants by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Talley, Monica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 42 Proposed Summons as to Certain Defendants by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Talley, Monica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants by Juul Labs, Inc. (Talley, Monica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 40 Waiver of re #37 MOTION for Service by Publication by Email by Juul Labs, Inc. (Talley, Monica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 39 Declaration re #37 MOTION for Service by Publication by Email by Monica Riva Talley by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Talley, Monica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 38 Memorandum in Support re #37 MOTION for Service by Publication by Email filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Talley, Monica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Service by Publication by Email by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 36 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 11, 2019 re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Talley, Monica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 35 Memorandum in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Talley, Monica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lei Yang, Evan Wilkins, Daniel Mendoza, Francis Noone, Marie DeFonte, Farva Jafri, Pasa Living, Sibel Toy, Abdulrasool Ghulamhussain, Jerry Millsap, John Jeffrey, Eric Legus, Schulman Conrad, Andrea Sperry, Xiaohua Fang, Kristina Placentia, Ray Nasser, Haylyuk Dall, Nicholas Broome, Joesine Himang Loloy, Mark Anthony Batersal, Ricky Pinedo, Yin Ping Li, Walter Furman, Shu Qing, Yuehua Huang, Zhu Qiongqi, Jim Smith, Xiao Huan, Ben Inguanzo, Phillip Evans, Shella May Limas, Mohammed Jaber, Jimmy Carl Teal, Jallal Ali, Vincenzo Velasco, William Miller, filed by Juul Labs, Inc..(Talley, Monica)
September 24, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to Motion for Preliminary injunction Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDERED that the Motion shall be, and hereby is, Granted; that the temporary restraining order granted on September 13, 2019, which is scheduled to expire on September 27, 2019, is extended in effect until October 11, 2019. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 09/23/2019. (choy, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service re #28 Memorandum in Support, #29 Declaration, #27 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order, #30 Waiver of by Monica Riva Talley on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Talley, Monica)
September 23, 2019 Filing 30 Waiver of re #27 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by Juul Labs, Inc. (Talley, Monica)
September 23, 2019 Filing 29 Declaration re #27 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by Monica Riva Talley by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Talley, Monica)
September 23, 2019 Filing 28 Memorandum in Support re #27 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Talley, Monica)
September 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - The Court will hear further matters in this case, including whether the TRO should be converted into a preliminary injunction, at 10:00 a.m. on Friday, September 27, 2019. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/13/2019. (awac, )
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #10 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/13/2019. (awac, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/13/2019. (awac, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Liam O'Grady:Motion Hearing held on 9/13/2019 re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Juul Labs, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff enters their appearance. No appearance for defendants. Mr. Novak presents argument. Court grants motion. Order to follow. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (Court Reporter N. Linnell.)(awac, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Seal is DENIED. Schedule A to the Complaint, Exhibit 2 to the Complaint, Exhibit 3 to the Complaint, and Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Asset Restraint and Expedited Discovery shall remain unsealed because they do not contain confidential proprietary information of the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 9/11/19. (klau, )
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice for Dennies Varughese. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 08/30/2019. (choy, )
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice for Daniel Steven Block. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 08/30/2019. (choy, )
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice for Nicholas John Nowak. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 08/30/2019. (choy, )
August 30, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (dvanm, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service re #15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Dennies Varughese and Certification of Local Counsel Monica Riva Talley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6812707. , #9 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s), #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #7 Sealed Document, #3 MOTION to Seal , #1 Complaint, #11 Sealed Memorandum in Support, #6 Waiver of, #12 Notice of Hearing Date, #14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Steven Block and Certification of Local Counsel Monica Riva Talley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6812703. , Initial Case Assignment, #13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas John Nowak and Certification of Local Counsel Monica Riva Talley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6812654. , #5 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C), #8 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s), #16 MOTION Report on the Filing of a Trademark Action (AO 120) re #1 Complaint , #2 Financial Disclosure Statement, #4 Memorandum in Support by Monica Riva Talley on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Talley, Monica)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 Report on the filing or determination of a Trademark action. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(aott, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION Report on the Filing of a Trademark Action (AO 120) re #1 Complaint by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Talley, Monica)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Dennies Varughese and Certification of Local Counsel Monica Riva Talley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6812707. by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Talley, Monica)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Steven Block and Certification of Local Counsel Monica Riva Talley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6812703. by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Talley, Monica)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas John Nowak and Certification of Local Counsel Monica Riva Talley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6812654. by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Talley, Monica)
August 29, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (aott, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Hearing Date set for September 13, 2019 re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Talley, Monica)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 Unsealed Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #3 MOTION to Seal . (Talley, Monica) Modified on 9/11/2019 Unsealed per order dated 9/11/19 (klau, ).
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Unsealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) (Exhibit 3 to Complaint) re #3 MOTION to Seal , #1 Complaint. (Talley, Monica) Modified on 9/11/2019 Unsealed per order dated 9/11/19 (klau, ).
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Unsealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) (Exhibit 2 to Complaint) re #3 MOTION to Seal , #1 Complaint. (Talley, Monica) Modified on 9/11/2019 Unsealed per order dated 9/11/19 (klau, ).
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Unsealed Document (Schedule A to Complaint) re #3 MOTION to Seal , #1 Complaint. (Talley, Monica) Modified on 9/11/2019 Unsealed per order dated 9/11/19 (klau, ).
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of re #3 MOTION to Seal by Juul Labs, Inc. (Talley, Monica)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Juul Labs, Inc. re #3 MOTION to Seal (Talley, Monica)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Seal filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Talley, Monica)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Talley, Monica)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against The Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6812344.), filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Talley, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juul Labs, Inc. v. The Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdulrasool Ghulamhussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Jaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yin Ping Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Anthony Batersal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhu Qiongqi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sibel Toy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Legus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shella May Limas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haylyuk Dall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joesine Himang Loloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiao Huan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jeffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Millsap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiaohua Fang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Broome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Noone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasa Living
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Carl Teal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lei Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie DeFonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Inguanzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farva Jafri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Placentia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conrad Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Nasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincenzo Velasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Pinedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Sperry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shu Qing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuehua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jallal Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Monica Riva Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?