Selph v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Virginia Selph
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Wal-Mart Supercenter and Manassas Wal-Mart Store
Case Number: 1:2019cv01152
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SO ORDERED; Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/25/2019. (choy, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Virginia Selph (Koster, Megan)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/21/2019. (jlan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2019: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jlan, ).
September 6, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (choy, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Murdock, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Murdock, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6822953.), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murdock, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selph v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: John Mark Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart
Represented By: John Mark Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Supercenter
Represented By: John Mark Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manassas Wal-Mart Store
Represented By: John Mark Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Selph
Represented By: Megan Ann Koster
Represented By: Brandon Mitchell Gladstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?